blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1059821

EP1059821 - Wireless telecommunication system having subscriber advanced personal service [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  15.11.2002
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 02.01.2003  [2003/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2002/11]
Former [2000/50]For all designated states
NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD.
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Peltonen, Miika
Kimmontie 4 A 19
90570 Oulu / FI
[2000/50]
Representative(s)Read, Matthew Charles, et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/50]Read, Matthew Charles, et al
Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date00303061.612.04.2000
[2000/50]
Priority number, dateUS1999032793508.06.1999         Original published format: US 327935
[2000/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1059821
Date:13.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1059821
Date:17.01.2001
[2001/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.2000
ClassificationIPC:H04Q7/38
[2000/50]
CPC:
H04W4/12 (EP,US); H04M1/72403 (EP,US); H04M1/7243 (EP,US);
H04M3/42 (EP,US); H04Q3/0029 (EP,US); H04M3/533 (EP,US);
H04W8/18 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/50]
TitleGerman:Drahtloses Telekommunikationssystem mit fortschrittlichen persönlichen Diensten[2000/50]
English:Wireless telecommunication system having subscriber advanced personal service[2000/50]
French:Système de télécommunication sans fil avec services personnalisés avancés[2000/50]
Examination procedure22.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/34]
07.11.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0717574  (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4,8,11,12,14,18,24 * column 5, line 5 - line 31 * * column 7, line 13 - line 25 *;
 [X]WO9722209  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US], et al) [X] 1,5,8,11,15,18,21,24,29 * page 21, line 28 - page 27, line 9 * * page 43, line 11 - line 18 * * page 55, line 4 - line 6 *;
 [X]EP0794681  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,8,11-13,18,24,28 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9742780  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1,11,24 * page 20, line 1 - page 33, line 25 *;
 [A]WO9826621  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1,11,24* page 6, line 5 - page 15, line 26 *;
 [X]EP0881847  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6,8,10-13,16,18,20,24 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.