Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1049005

EP1049005 - System and method for improving the manageability and usability of a java environment [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/44]System and method for improving the manageability and usability of a java envrinment
[2000/51]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  05.10.2007
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2007Refusal of applicationpublished on 07.11.2007  [2007/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Spyker, Andrew, IBM United Kingdom Limited
Intellectual Property Law, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
02 / Walnock, Matthew David, IBM United Kingdom Limited
Intellectual Property Law, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Burt, Roger James
IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester
Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]Burt, Roger James, Dr.
IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park
Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Application number, filing date00303100.212.04.2000
[2000/44]
Priority number, dateUS1999030004127.04.1999         Original published format: US 300041
[2000/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1049005
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1049005
Date:26.01.2005
[2005/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP15.12.2004
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/445, G06F9/44
[2005/04]
Former International [2000/44]G06F9/44, G06F9/445
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/44]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zum Verbessern der Brauchbarkeit und Handhabbarkeit einer Java-Umgebung[2000/44]
English:System and method for improving the manageability and usability of a java environment[2000/51]
French:Système et procédé pour améliorer la gestion et l'utilité de l'environnement Java[2000/44]
Former [2000/44]System and method for improving the manageability and usability of a java envrinment
Examination procedure11.02.2005Examination requested  [2005/15]
14.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.06.2007
20.06.2007Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/45]
27.06.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
30.06.2007Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
15.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
19.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
16.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5835777  (STAELIN CARL [US]) [Y] 2-10 * column 1, line 51 - line 57 * * column 2, line 7 - line 21 * * column 2, line 43 - line 59 * * column 3, line 2 - line 13 * * column 4, line 22 - line 33 * * column 5, line 36 - line 46 *;
 [XY]  "Using JBindery", APPLE HOMEPAGE, (19980619), URL: http://developer.apple.com/documentation/mac/pdf/JBindery.pdf, (20040430), XP002278671 [X] 1 * figure 1-2 * * figure 1-3 * * page 7 - page 8 * * page 11 * * page 12 * * page 16 * [Y] 2-10
 [A]  ROBERT ORFALI, DAN HARKEY, Client/Server Programming with Java and CORBA, U.S.A., JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC., XP002279159 [A] * page 133 * * page 521, paragraph 2 * * page 557 *