Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1056113

EP1056113 - Ion implanter and a method of implanting ions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.02.2008
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.03.2008  [2008/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Applied Materials, Inc.
3050 Bowers Avenue
M/S 2061
Santa Clara, California 95054-3299 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]For all designated states
APPLIED MATERIALS, INC.
3050 Bowers Avenue, M/S 2061
Santa Clara, California 95054-3299 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Glavish, Hilton F.
P.O. Box 4348, 803 Tyner Way
Incline Village NV 89450 / US
02 / Gordon, John Stuart
10180 Parkwood Drive No. 8
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
[2000/48]
Representative(s)Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date00303209.117.04.2000
[2000/48]
Priority number, dateUS1999032173128.05.1999         Original published format: US 321731
[2000/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1056113
Date:29.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1056113
Date:28.02.2007
[2007/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP31.01.2007
ClassificationInternational:H01J37/317, H01J37/30, H01J3/36
[2000/48]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2007/44]
Former [2000/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ionenimplantierungsgerät und Verfahren zur Ionenimplantierung[2000/48]
English:Ion implanter and a method of implanting ions[2000/48]
French:Implanteur d'ions et procédé d'implantation ionique[2000/48]
Examination procedure29.08.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/13]
30.10.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2008/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
06.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
09.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200506   M06   Fee paid on   09.08.2005
30.04.200708   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US3324340  (JACQUES PINEL, et al) [Y] 1-8 * figures 3-5,12 * * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 35 *;
 [A]EP0514585  (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * figures 9,11,13,20 *;
 [A]US5744919  (MISHIN ANDREY V [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * figures 2,4 *
 [Y]  ROSE P H, "ADVANCED ION BEAM EQUIPMENT USED FOR SEMICONDUCTOR PRODUCTION", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH, SECTION - B: BEAM INTERACTIONS WITH MATERIALS AND ATOMS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19890202), vol. B37/38, no. 2, ISSN 0168-583X, pages 22 - 27, XP000111443 [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * page 24, column L - column R * * figures 4,5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-583X(89)90130-4