Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1047279

EP1047279 - Mobile terminal and method for preventing loss of information during handover [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  03.10.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 19.11.2003  [2003/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/43]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Orsic, Milo
6545 Leroy Street
Lincolnwood, IL 60646 / US
[2000/43]
Representative(s)Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green
Essex IG8 0TU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/43]Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date00303269.518.04.2000
[2000/43]
Priority number, dateUS1999029489120.04.1999         Original published format: US 294891
[2000/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1047279
Date:25.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1047279
Date:10.01.2001
[2001/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38, H04L29/06, H04L29/12
[2001/02]
Former International [2000/43]H04Q7/38
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/39]
Former [2000/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Mobiles Endgerät und Verfahren zum Vermeiden von Datenverlust während des Weiterreichens[2000/43]
English:Mobile terminal and method for preventing loss of information during handover[2000/43]
French:Terminal mobile et procédé pour prévenir la perte d'information pendant transfert cellulaire[2000/43]
Examination procedure28.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/35]
19.09.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
11.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200203   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0578041  (IBM [US]) [X] 1,2,5-8,33,34,38,39 * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 17 * * column 6, line 4 - column 8, line 5 * * column 11, line 27 - column 12, line 40 * [A] 14,16-19,23;
 [XP]EP0967769  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [XP] 1-10,14-21,23-39 * column 2, line 30 - column 9, line 56 *
 [X]  CACERES R ET AL, "Fast and scalable wireless handoffs in support of mobile Internet audio", MOBILE NETWORKS AND APPLICATIONS,BALTZER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BUSSUM,NL, (199901), vol. 3, no. 4, ISSN 1383-469X, pages 351 - 363, XP002135845 [X] 1,2,5-8,23,33 * page 355, column L, line 39 - column R, line 2; figures 1-3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1019149404614