Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1048696

EP1048696 - Method for preparation of hydrophobic precipitated silica [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.10.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.12.2005  [2005/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Corning Corporation
3901 S. Saginaw Road
Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
DOW CORNING CORPORATION
3901 S. Saginaw Road
Midland Michigan 48686-0994 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Burns, Gary Thomas
Route de la Marache, 19B
1380 Ohain / BE
02 / Deng, Qin
306 Burning Bush Lane
Midland, Michigan 48642 / US
03 / Hahn, James Richard
2988 Martin Court
Midland, Michigan 48640 / US
04 / Krivak, Thomas G.
2 Highview Circle
Harrison City, Pennsylvania 15636 / US
05 / Okel, Timothy A.
111 Old Gate Road
Trafford, Pennsylvania 15085 / US
06 / Reese, Clifford Carlton
3664 Acorn Lane
Midland, Michigan 48642 / US
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Kyle, Diana
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]Kyle, Diana
Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date00303304.019.04.2000
[2000/44]
Priority number, dateUS1999029986328.04.1999         Original published format: US 299863
[2000/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1048696
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1048696
Date:07.02.2001
[2001/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1048696
Date:15.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:C09C1/30, C09C3/12, C01B33/193
[2000/44]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/43]
Former [2000/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung hydrophober gefällter Kieselsäure[2000/44]
English:Method for preparation of hydrophobic precipitated silica[2000/44]
French:Procédé de préparation de silice de précipitation hydrophobe[2000/44]
Examination procedure23.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/33]
18.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.2004Fee for grant paid
06.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0900829  (DOW CORNING [US]) [X] 1-5,7,8 * claims 1,5-8,10 * * column 2, line 30 - line 54 * * column 3, line 38 - column 6, line 15 * * examples 1,2 * [A] 6;
 [PX]WO9936356  (CABOT CORP [US]) [PX] 1,3-8 * claims 1-5,10,12-14 * * page 5, line 16 - page 8, line 2 * * page 8, line 33 - page 9, line 26 * * example 1 *;
 [PXA]EP0928818  (DOW CORNING [US]) [PX] 1,2,4-8 * the whole document * [PA] 3;
 [A]US5708069  (BURNS GARY THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * claims 1-9,15,16 * * column 4, line 33 - column 6, line 61 *;
 [A]GB907179  (DOW CORNING) [A] * the whole document *;
 [A]GB682574  (DOW CORNING LTD)