Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1091017

EP1091017 - Coating apparatus having reflective inside coating [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.12.2009
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.01.2010  [2010/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[2009/07]
Former [2001/15]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Stowell, William Randolph
3379 Salem Ridge Road
Rising Sun, Indiana 47040 / US
02 / Conner, Jeffrey Allen
6206 Juneberry Court
Hamilton, Ohio 45011 / US
03 / Ackerman, John Frederick
1514 Palomino Drive
Laramie, Wyoming 82070 / US
04 / Evans, John Douglas, Sr.
3970 Johnson Road
Springfield, Ohio 45502 / US
05 / Maricocchi Antonio Frank
101 Citation Court
Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US
 [2001/15]
Representative(s)Pedder, James Cuthbert , et al
London Patent Operation
General Electric International, Inc.
15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/15]Pedder, James Cuthbert , et al
GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date00303310.719.04.2000
[2001/15]
Priority number, dateUS1999029396519.04.1999         Original published format: US 293965
[2001/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1091017
Date:11.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1091017
Date:02.07.2003
[2003/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1091017
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:C23C14/56, C23C14/24, C23C16/44
[2003/27]
Former International [2001/15]C23C14/56, C23C14/24
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/13]
Former [2001/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Beschichtungsanlage mit Innenoberfläche mit einer reflektierenden Schicht[2001/15]
English:Coating apparatus having reflective inside coating[2001/15]
French:Appareillage de revêtement avec une surface intérieure munie d'une couche réfléchissante[2001/15]
Examination procedure02.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/11]
05.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.12.2008Fee for grant paid
12.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
02.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
02.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4977855  (OHMI TADAHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3,5 * column 8, line 7 - line 51 *;
 [Y]US5576885  (LOWE MARTIN [GB], et al) [Y] 1-3,5 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0863227  (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 7, lines 11-17 *;
 [A]DE19803487  (LG SEMICON CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 6 *;
 [A]WO9902757  (ADVANCED SEMICONDUCTOR MAT [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 9, line 32 - line 35 *;
 [A]  STONE J ET AL, "REFLECTANCE, TRANSMITTANCE, AND LOSS SPECTRA OF MULTILAYER SI/SIO2 THIN FILM MIRRORS AND ANTIREFLECTION COATINGS", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA,WASHINGTON, US, (19900201), vol. 29, no. 4, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 583 - 588, XP000094503 [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.29.000583