Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1049354

EP1049354 - Electric heating/warming fabric articles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.10.2006
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MALDEN MILLS INDUSTRIES, INC.
46 Stafford Street, P.O. Box 809 Lawrence
Massachusetts 01842 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/50]For all designated states
MALDEN MILLS INDUSTRIES, INC.
46 Stafford Street, P.O. Box 809 Lawrence
Massachusetts 01842 / US
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
MALDEN MILLS INDUSTRIES, INC.
46 Stafford Street, P.O. Box 809
Lawrence, Massachusetts 01842 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rock, Moshe
18 Korinthian Way
Andover, MA 01810 / US
02 / Sharma, Vikram
9 Celestine Terrace
Stoneham, MA 02180 / US
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Murray, Elisabeth Anne , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/19]Murray, Elisabeth Anne , et al
Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2SQ / GB
Former [2000/44]Colmer, Stephen Gary , et al
Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date00303375.020.04.2000
[2000/44]
Priority number, dateUS1999029637522.04.1999         Original published format: US 296375
[2000/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1049354
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1049354
Date:14.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:H05B3/34, D04B1/04
[2000/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/44]
TitleGerman:Elektrische Heizung oder Erwärmung Stoffwaren[2000/44]
English:Electric heating/warming fabric articles[2000/44]
French:Articles d'étoffe chauffant électriquement[2000/44]
Examination procedure02.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
30.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
12.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.10.2005Fee for grant paid
17.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/47]
Request for further processing for:12.01.2005Request for further processing filed
12.01.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.01.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
20.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.12.2005
BE14.12.2005
CH14.12.2005
CY14.12.2005
FI14.12.2005
IT14.12.2005
LI14.12.2005
NL14.12.2005
DK14.03.2006
GR14.03.2006
SE14.03.2006
ES25.03.2006
IE20.04.2006
LU20.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
PT15.05.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/36]AT14.12.2005
BE14.12.2005
CH14.12.2005
FI14.12.2005
IT14.12.2005
LI14.12.2005
NL14.12.2005
DK14.03.2006
GR14.03.2006
SE14.03.2006
ES25.03.2006
IE20.04.2006
LU20.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
PT15.05.2006
Former [2007/35]AT14.12.2005
BE14.12.2005
CH14.12.2005
FI14.12.2005
IT14.12.2005
LI14.12.2005
NL14.12.2005
DK14.03.2006
GR14.03.2006
SE14.03.2006
ES25.03.2006
IE20.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
PT15.05.2006
Former [2007/12]AT14.12.2005
BE14.12.2005
CH14.12.2005
FI14.12.2005
LI14.12.2005
NL14.12.2005
DK14.03.2006
GR14.03.2006
SE14.03.2006
ES25.03.2006
IE20.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
PT15.05.2006
Former [2007/07]AT14.12.2005
BE14.12.2005
CH14.12.2005
FI14.12.2005
LI14.12.2005
NL14.12.2005
DK14.03.2006
GR14.03.2006
SE14.03.2006
ES25.03.2006
MC30.04.2006
PT15.05.2006
Former [2006/51]AT14.12.2005
BE14.12.2005
CH14.12.2005
FI14.12.2005
LI14.12.2005
NL14.12.2005
DK14.03.2006
GR14.03.2006
SE14.03.2006
ES25.03.2006
PT15.05.2006
Former [2006/48]AT14.12.2005
BE14.12.2005
CH14.12.2005
FI14.12.2005
LI14.12.2005
NL14.12.2005
GR14.03.2006
SE14.03.2006
ES25.03.2006
PT15.05.2006
Former [2006/45]AT14.12.2005
BE14.12.2005
CH14.12.2005
FI14.12.2005
LI14.12.2005
NL14.12.2005
GR14.03.2006
SE14.03.2006
ES25.03.2006
Former [2006/38]AT14.12.2005
BE14.12.2005
CH14.12.2005
FI14.12.2005
LI14.12.2005
GR14.03.2006
SE14.03.2006
ES25.03.2006
Former [2006/36]AT14.12.2005
BE14.12.2005
CH14.12.2005
FI14.12.2005
LI14.12.2005
SE14.03.2006
ES25.03.2006
Former [2006/34]AT14.12.2005
CH14.12.2005
FI14.12.2005
LI14.12.2005
SE14.03.2006
ES25.03.2006
Former [2006/33]CH14.12.2005
FI14.12.2005
LI14.12.2005
SE14.03.2006
Former [2006/27]FI14.12.2005
SE14.03.2006
Former [2006/23]FI14.12.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2740934  (DORURES LOUIS MATHIEU IND [FR]) [X] 4,9,15 * figures 1,2; claims 1,3,5 *;
 [A]EP0532468  (TECNIT TISSU TRUST REG [LI]) [A] 1-4,9 * column 4, line 32 - column 5, line 3; figure 1; claims 1,4 *;
 [A]US3232080  (TOSHIAKI INUI) [A] 1,4,8,9 * column 1, line 33 - column 2, line 19; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]DE1690576  (INUI TOSHIAKI) [A] 4,6,10,11,14,18 * page 4, line 19 - line 26; figures 1B,7,8; claims 4,5 *;
 [A]EP0548574  (BAUERHIN I G ELEKTRO TECH [DE]);
 [A]GB609897  (THERMAT LTD, et al);
 [A]DE19728386  (AMES EUROP BV [NL])