EP1055879 - A combustion chamber assembly and a method of operating a combustion chamber assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.12.2005 [2005/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states ROLLS-ROYCE PLC 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Willis, Jeffrey Douglas 17 Hothorpe Close Ernsford Grange, Coventry CV3 2HX / GB | 02 /
Melville, James 128 Normanton Lane Littleover, Derby DE23 6LF / GB | [2000/48] | Representative(s) | Gunn, Michael Alan Rolls-Royce plc Patents Department P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | Gunn, Michael Alan Rolls-Royce plc P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00303463.4 | 25.04.2000 | [2000/48] | Priority number, date | GB19990011867 | 22.05.1999 Original published format: GB 9911867 | [2000/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1055879 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1055879 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/34, F23R3/14, F23R3/28, F23R3/26 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
F23R3/14 (EP,US);
F23R3/26 (EP,US);
F23R3/286 (EP,US);
F23R3/346 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/33] |
Former [2000/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Brennkammeranordnung und Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Brennkammeranordnung | [2000/48] | English: | A combustion chamber assembly and a method of operating a combustion chamber assembly | [2000/48] | French: | Ensemble chambre de combustion et procédé de fonctionnement d'un ensemble chambre de combustion | [2000/48] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 23.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US5533329 (OHYAMA YOSHISHIGE [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,9,10,13,17,18 * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 24 * * column 6, line 39 - column 7, line 3 * * column 8, line 3 - line 67 * * column 9, line 39 - line 44 * * column 12, line 25 - line 46 * * figures 1,4,8,9 * [A] 20,22,23,29 [Y] 3,4; | [XA]EP0281961 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,13,22,23 * column 4, line 2 - line 46 * * column 5, line 6 - line 48 * * column 8, line 23 - line 35 * * figure 1 * [A] 4,5; | [XA]EP0529900 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,9,13 * column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 22 * * column 6, line 41 - column 7, line 18 * * column 8, line 29 - line 49 * * column 9, line 46 - column 10, line 39 * * figures 2,4 * [A] 17,18,22; | [YA]US5802854 (MAEDA FUKUO [JP], et al) [Y] 3 * column 6, line 15 - column 7, line 17 * * column 7, line 65 - column 9, line 42 * * column 9, line 67 - column 10, line 46 * * figures 1-3,6,7 * [A] 2,4-10,22,23; | [YA]US5640851 (TOON IAN J [GB], et al) [Y] 4 * column 6, line 34 - column 7, line 36 * * column 9, line 16 - line 30 * * figures 2,3,7 * [A] 2,6,9,10,22,23; | [A]US5836164 (TSUKAHARA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4-6,8-10,13,22,23,26-28 * column 7, line 66 - column 8, line 28 * * column 8, line 49 - column 9, line 39 * * column 10, line 17 - column 11, line 7 * * column 16, line 53 - column 17, line 23 * * figures 1,3,4,15 *; | [A]US4910957 (MORENO FREDERICK E [US], et al) [A] 1,2,22,23,26-28 * column 4, line 45 - line 58 * * column 5, line 15 - column 6, line 27 * * column 6, line 63 - line 68 * * column 7, line 31 - column 8, line 2 * * figures 1,5,8,9 * | by applicant | WO9207221 | GB19820098007 | GB19740099000 |