blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1052240


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.01.2004 No opposition filed within time limit published on  10.03.2004  [2004/11]
31.01.2003 (Expected) grant published on  19.03.2003  [2003/12]
24.01.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.09.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
19.04.2002 Renewal fee
19.02.2002 Examination report or reply
18.10.2001 Change - extension states
12.10.2001 First examination report
05.10.2001 Examination report or reply
17.08.2001 Change - applicant published on  04.10.2001 [2001/40]
10.08.2001 Change - representative published on  26.09.2001 [2001/39]
15.06.2001 Definitive list of designations published on  01.08.2001 [2001/31]
29.09.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.11.2000 [2000/46]
29.09.2000 Request for examination filed published on  15.11.2000 [2000/46]