blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1052240
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6307094 23.10.2001B1
Priority number Date
US56465600 02.05.2000
US13343499 11.05.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20000077194Global Dossier 26.12.2000A
Priority number Date
US13343499 11.05.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2000336065Global Dossier 05.12.2000A
Priority number Date
US13343499 11.05.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1052240Global Dossier 19.03.2003B1
EP1052240 15.11.2000A1
Priority number Date
US13343499 11.05.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AU3251000 16.11.2000A
Priority number Date
US13343499 11.05.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
BR0002096 02.01.2001A
Priority number Date
US13343499 11.05.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1273234 15.11.2000A
Priority number Date
US13343499 11.05.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE60001686T 21.08.2003T2
DE60001686D 24.04.2003D1
Priority number Date
US13343499 11.05.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
IL135864D 20.05.2001D0
Priority number Date
US13343499 11.05.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
MXPA00004328 08.03.2002A
Priority number Date
US13343499 11.05.1999