blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1052240

Designated contracting states CH 
 DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
 LI 
Examination procedure09.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
European patent granted19.03.2003
Opposition procedure22.12.2003No opposition filed within time limit published on 10.03.2004 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:15.11.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):CH DE FR GB IT LI
 
Event date:15.11.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:15.11.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000511
 
Event date:01.08.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:CH DE FR GB IT LI
 
Event date:04.10.2001 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:DOW AGROSCIENCES LLC
 
Event date:28.11.2001 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20011010
 
Event date:19.03.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):CH DE FR GB IT LI
 
Event date:19.03.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:27.03.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE
 
Event date:27.03.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:FIAMMENGHI-FIAMMENGHI
 
Event date:31.03.2003 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20030331
Year of Fee Payment:04
 
Event date:24.04.2003 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:60001686
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20030424
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:16.05.2003 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20030516
Year of Fee Payment:04
 
Event date:19.12.2003 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:10.03.2004 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20031222
 
Event date:27.04.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20040427
 
Event date:30.04.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20040430
 
Event date:30.04.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20040430
 
Event date:03.11.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20041103
 
Event date:30.11.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20041130
 
Event date:15.12.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:15.12.2004 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20040427
 
Event date:07.01.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
 
Event date:27.04.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20050427