Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1052240

EP1052240 - Process for the preparation of substituted 3-hydroxybutyrate esters [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.01.2004
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.03.2004  [2004/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow AgroSciences, LLC
9330 Zionsville Road
Indianapolis, Indiana 46268 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/40]For all designated states
Dow AgroSciences LLC
9330 Zionsville Road
Indianapolis, Indiana 46268 / US
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY
100 Independence Mall West
Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Chong, Joshua Anthony
112 Field Terrace
Lansdale, Pennsylvania 19446 / US
02 / Abdesaken, Fereydon
269 Westwind Way
Dresher, Pennsylvania 19025 / US
03 / Spangler, Lori Ann
115 Elm Avenue
Churchville, Pennsylvania 18966 / US
04 / Roemmele, Renee Caroline
1030 Fulton Road
Maple Glen, Pennsylvania 19002 / US
05 / Stephens, Randall Wayne
114 Stoneycrest Drive
Perkasie, Pennsylvania 18944 / US
06 / Nightingale, Peter David
Vale Cottage Millbrow, Marple Bridge
Stockport SK6 5LW / GB
07 / Hartley, David John
4 Belmont Street, Monton Eccles
Manchester M30 9NZ / GB
[2000/46]
Representative(s)Huber, Bernhard , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann, Patentanwälte, Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/39]Huber, Bernhard, Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann, Patentanwälte, Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Former [2000/46]Buckley, Guy Julian , et al
ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue
Croydon CR9 3NB / GB
Application number, filing date00303542.527.04.2000
[2000/46]
Priority number, dateUS19990133434P11.05.1999         Original published format: US 133434 P
[2000/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1052240
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1052240
Date:19.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07C67/31, C07C69/675
[2000/46]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2001/31]
Former [2000/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Herstellen von substituierten 3-Hydroxybuttersäureester[2000/46]
English:Process for the preparation of substituted 3-hydroxybutyrate esters[2000/46]
French:Procédé de préparation d'esters de l'acide 3-hydroxybutyrique substitué[2000/46]
Examination procedure11.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
10.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.2003Fee for grant paid
09.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.12.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[DA]  - FAIZULLA G. KATHAWALA ET AL., "Stereoselective Reduction of delta-Hydroxy-beta-ketoesters", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA., VERLAG HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA. BASEL., CH, (19860618), vol. 69, no. 4, ISSN 0018-019X, pages 803 - 805, XP002145104 [DA] 1 * page 803, paragraph 4 - page 804, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19860690407
 [A]  - REUBEN G. JONES, "Aliphatic Ketones and Amines Containing the Trifluoromethyl Group", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY., AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC., US, (19480203), vol. 70, no. 1, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 143 - 144, XP002145105 [A] 1 * page 144, column L, paragraph 5 - paragraph 6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01181a041