Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1050665

EP1050665 - Bushing retention system for cooling tubes in a gas turbine rotor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.10.2006
Database last updated on 19.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/45]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Mashey, Thomas Charles
102 Saint Clair
Anderson, SC 29626 / US
[2000/46]
Former [2000/45]01 / Mashey, Thomas Charles
A-25 Tammy Trail
Coxsackie, New York 12051 / US
Representative(s)Goode, Ian Roy , et al
London Patent Operation
General Electric International, Inc.
15 John Adam Street
London
WC2N 6LU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Goode, Ian Roy , et al
London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London
WC2N 6LU / GB
Former [2000/45]Goode, Ian Roy , et al
GE LONDON PATENT OPERATION, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date00303636.528.04.2000
[2000/45]
Priority number, dateUS1999030420203.05.1999         Original published format: US 304202
[2000/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1050665
Date:08.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1050665
Date:20.11.2002
[2002/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1050665
Date:07.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:F01D5/08, F01D5/06, F16B21/18
[2002/47]
Former International [2000/45]F01D5/08, F01D5/06
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2003/32]
Former [2000/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Klemmring zur Fixierung von Kühlrohren in einem Gasturbinenrotor[2000/45]
English:Bushing retention system for cooling tubes in a gas turbine rotor[2000/45]
French:Dispositif de fixation des tubes de refroidissement dans un rotor d'une turbine à gaz[2000/45]
Examination procedure20.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/29]
23.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.2005Fee for grant paid
04.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/45]
Former [2007/35]IT07.12.2005
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0735238  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1-7 * column 14, line 29 - column 15, line 28 * * figure 10 *;
 [Y]CH262051  (EBAUCHES AG [CH]) [Y] 1-7 * page 1, line 34 - page 2, line 2 * * figure 3 *;
 [A]DE1016507  (HAUHINCO MASCHF) [A] 1-7 * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 61 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]US4343581  (MILLHEISER MELVIN) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 45 - line 48 *;
 [A]US1758515  (HUGO HEIERMANN) [A] 1 * figures 5,6 *;
 [A]JPH1150803
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, [A] * abstract *