Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1052532

EP1052532 - Quick connect fiber optic connector having a deformable barrel [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.05.2006
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 15.07.2009  [2009/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Carlisle, Arthur Wallace
1349 Wyntercreek Road
Dunwoody, GA 30338 / US
02 / Hicks, Jeffrey H.
1083 Indian Way
Lilburn, GA 30247 / US
03 / Siereveld, John L.
4819 Victorian Court
Marietta, GA 30066 / US
04 / Vicory, William A.
4015 Chery Ridge Walk
Suwanee, GA 30024 / US
05 / White, Williard C.
1 Cherrystone Court
Suwanee, GA 30024 / US
[2000/46]
Representative(s)Schoppe, Fritz , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler
Patentanwälte
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/29]Schoppe, Fritz , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Former [2002/12]Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 71 08 67
81458 München / DE
Former [2000/46]Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr. , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date00303698.503.05.2000
[2000/46]
Priority number, dateUS1999031148313.05.1999         Original published format: US 311483
[2000/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1052532
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1052532
Date:23.04.2003
[2003/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/38
[2000/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/03]
Former [2000/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schnellmontierbarer faseroptischer Stecker mit verformbarer Hülse[2000/46]
English:Quick connect fiber optic connector having a deformable barrel[2000/46]
French:Connecteur pour fibre optique à connection rapide ayant une virole déformable[2000/46]
Examination procedure24.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/35]
16.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
07.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.11.2005Fee for grant paid
23.11.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/23]
04.01.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200506   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YA]US5287425  (CHANG PETER C) [Y] 1-5,7,11-14,18-21 * figure 2 * [A] 16,17;
 [YA]US4743084  (MANNING RANDY M) [Y] 1-5,7,11-14,18-21 * column 4, lines 58-63 - column 5, lines 19-23; figure 1 * [A] 16,17