Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1050940

EP1050940 - Clip for mounting objects on a wall stud [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2004
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomas & Betts International, Inc.
250 Lillard Drive Sparks
Nevada 89434 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/45]For all designated states
Thomas & Betts International, Inc.
250 Lillard Drive
Sparks, Nevada 89434 / US
Former [2000/45]For all designated states
Thomas & Betts International, Inc.
250 Lillard Drive
Sparks, Nevada 89431 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Pfaller, Mark J.
7676 Deerfield Trace
Memphis, TN 38133 / US
02 / Bailey, Mark A.
400 Steve Street
Senatobia, MS 38668 / US
[2000/45]
Representative(s)Howick, Nicholas Keith
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London
WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/45]Howick, Nicholas Keith
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date00303772.805.05.2000
[2000/45]
Priority number, dateUS19990132576P05.05.1999         Original published format: US 132576 P
[2000/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1050940
Date:08.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1050940
Date:12.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:H02G3/12
[2000/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/45]
TitleGerman:Klammer zur Befestigung von Objekten auf einer Ständerwand[2002/30]
English:Clip for mounting objects on a wall stud[2000/45]
French:Attache de fixation d'objets sur un poteau mural[2002/30]
Former [2000/45]Klammer zur Befestigung von einem Objekt auf einer Ständerwand
Former [2000/45]Attache de fixation d'un objet sur un poteau mural
Examination procedure26.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/26]
27.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.12.2002Fee for grant paid
03.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.12.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.03.2003
BE12.03.2003
CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
GR12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
CY05.05.2003
IE05.05.2003
LU05.05.2003
DK12.06.2003
SE12.06.2003
PT16.06.2003
[2004/39]
Former [2004/36]AT12.03.2003
BE12.03.2003
CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
GR12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
CY05.05.2003
IE05.05.2003
DK12.06.2003
SE12.06.2003
PT16.06.2003
Former [2004/29]AT12.03.2003
BE12.03.2003
CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
GR12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
IE05.05.2003
DK12.06.2003
SE12.06.2003
PT16.06.2003
Former [2004/23]AT12.03.2003
BE12.03.2003
CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
GR12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
DK12.06.2003
SE12.06.2003
PT16.06.2003
Former [2004/10]AT12.03.2003
BE12.03.2003
CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
GR12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
SE12.06.2003
PT16.06.2003
Former [2003/50]AT12.03.2003
CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
GR12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
SE12.06.2003
PT16.06.2003
Former [2003/47]AT12.03.2003
CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
GR12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
PT16.06.2003
Former [2003/46]CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
GR12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
PT16.06.2003
Former [2003/43]CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
PT16.06.2003
Former [2003/41]CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
Former [2003/40]CH12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4971280  (RINDERER ERIC R [US]) [X] 1,5,6,11 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 32; figures 1-7 * [A] 7-10;
 [A]US3780209  (SCHUPLIN J) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *