Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1052571

EP1052571 - A method and apparatus for downloading software into an embedded-system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  15.06.2007
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2007Refusal of applicationpublished on 18.07.2007  [2007/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tadiran Telecom Business Systems Ltd.
18 Hasivim Street
Petach-Tikva 49517 / IL
[N/P]
Former [2002/24]For all designated states
Tadiran Telecom Business Systems Ltd.
18 Hasivim Street
Petach-Tikvah 49517 / IL
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
ECI Telecom Ltd.
30 Hasivim Street, P.O. Box 3083
Petach Tikva 49133 / IL
Inventor(s)01 / Garfunkel, Arie
15 Herzog Street
Givataim 53600 / IL
02 / Szust, Avigail
19/14 Zichron Yaakov Street
Petach, Tikva / IL
[2000/46]
Representative(s)Curell Aguilà, Marcelino
CURELL SUÑOL S.L.P.
Passeig de Gràcia 65 bis
08008 Barcelona / ES
[N/P]
Former [2002/24]Curell Aguilà, Marcelino
Dr. Ing. M. Curell Sunol I.I. S.L. Agentes de la Propiedad Industrial Passeig de Gracia, 65 bis
E-08008 Barcelona / ES
Former [2001/45]Frost, Alex John
Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2001/26]Evans, Huw David Duncan , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Three Trinity Court, 21-27 Newport Road
Cardiff CF24 OAA / GB
Former [2000/46]Rees, Alexander Ellison , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 30 Welbeck Street
London W1M 7PG / GB
Application number, filing date00303809.805.05.2000
[2000/46]
Priority number, dateIL1999012994713.05.1999         Original published format: IL 12994799
[2000/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1052571
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1052571
Date:19.01.2005
[2005/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.2004
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/445, G06F11/14
[2005/03]
Former International [2000/46]G06F9/445
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/46]
TitleGerman:Ein Verfahren und Gerät zum Herunterladen von Software in ein eingebettetes System[2000/46]
English:A method and apparatus for downloading software into an embedded-system[2000/46]
French:Méthode et appareil pour télécharger des logiciels en un système incorporé[2000/46]
Examination procedure31.05.2005Examination requested  [2005/30]
23.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2007Date of oral proceedings
06.02.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
07.02.2007Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/29]
20.02.2007Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
13.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
30.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
29.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0524719  (DELL USA LP [US]) [X] 1-3,6-8,10,13-15,18,19 * page 3, line 36 - line 38 * * page 3, line 52 - page 4, line 31 * * page 4, line 44 - line 51 * * page 7, line 11 - line 13 * * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 36 * * page 19, line 44 - page 21, line 25 * * page 28, line 14 - page 32, line 34 * [Y] 4,5,9,11,12,16,17,20-23;
 [YA]EP0848341  (WEBTV NETWORKS INC [US]) [Y] 9,20,21 * column 7, line 21 - line 37 * * column 7, line 47 - line 53 * * column 9, line 42 - column 10, line 17 * * column 10, line 38 - column 11, line 3 * * column 11, line 26 - column 12, line 3 * * column 14, line 57 - column 15, line 19 * [A] 4,6,15,16,18,21;
 [Y]WO9838820  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [Y] 4,5,11,12,16,17,22,23 * abstract *;
 [A]US5870520  (LEE MIN EIG [US], et al) [A] 3,6,8,15,18,21 * column 3, line 31 - line 59 * * column 4, line 11 - line 18 * * column 5, line 3 - line 15 * * column 8, line 58 - column 9, line 17 *