Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1052218

EP1052218 - Fuel filling arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.02.2004
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.03.2004  [2004/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AVON INFLATABLES LIMITED
Dafen Llanelli
Carmarthenshire SA14 8NA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
Avon Inflatables Limited
Dafen
Llanelli, Carmarthenshire SA14 8NA / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Esq, Anthony Davies
Caedelyn, 2 Penyfai Lane
LLanelli, Carmarthenshire SA15 4EN / GB
[2000/46]
Representative(s)Harrison, David Christopher , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]Harrison, David Christopher , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date00303824.708.05.2000
[2000/46]
Priority number, dateGB1999001082710.05.1999         Original published format: GB 9910827
[2000/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1052218
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:B67D5/32, B60K15/04, B63B25/08
[2000/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/46]
TitleGerman:Kraftstoffabfüllanordnung[2000/46]
English:Fuel filling arrangement[2000/46]
French:Agencement de remplissage de carburants[2000/46]
Examination procedure14.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/29]
07.06.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/14]
01.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/14]
Request for further processing for:14.10.2002Request for further processing filed
14.10.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.12.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0761487  (VETUS DEN OUDEN N V [NL]) [X] 1-5,7,16 * column 5, line 20 - line 27 * * column 5, line 47 * * figure 4 *;
 [X]GB2240096  (FORD MOTOR CO [GB]) [X] 1,5,10,15 * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 6; figure . *;
 [X]GB2030941  (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1,5,10 * figure 4 *;
 [X]US5662149  (ARMELLINO GARY [US]) [X] 1,5,16 * figure 5 *;
 [X]US5571249  (BOYLEN DANIEL B [US]) [X] 1,5 * figures 4,5 *;
 [X]FR2467820  (PERRIER EMILE [FR]) [X] 1 * figure 2 *