Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1052873

EP1052873 - A memory management technique for maintaining packet order in a packet processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.02.2005
Database last updated on 23.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.03.2005  [2005/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel
St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2003/41]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel
St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor
Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Scheinbart, Marvin
98 Garrison Road
Chelmsford, MA 01824 / US
02 / Ladwig, Geoffrey B.
28 Muriel Road
Chelmsford, MA 01824 / US
03 / Angle, Richard
54 Fiske Road
Wellesley, MA 02181 / US
[2000/46]
Representative(s)Coyle, Philip Aidan , et al
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]Coyle, Philip Aidan , et al
F. R. KELLY & CO. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Former [2000/46]Dearling, Bruce Clive , et al
Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley, Merlin House, Falconry Court, Bakers Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Application number, filing date00303937.710.05.2000
[2000/46]
Priority number, dateUS1999030947110.05.1999         Original published format: US 309471
[2000/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1052873
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1052873
Date:22.10.2003
[2003/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.09.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04Q11/04
[2000/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/29]
Former [2000/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Speicherverwaltungsverfahren zum bewharen der packetenorderung in einem Packetverarbeitungssystem[2000/46]
English:A memory management technique for maintaining packet order in a packet processing system[2000/46]
French:Technique de gestion de la memoire pour préserver l' ordre des paquets dans un système de traitement des paquets[2000/46]
Examination procedure22.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/25]
13.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/13]
28.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
01.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]  MIYAHO N ET AL, "INTEGRATED SWITCHING ARCHITECTURE AND ITS TRAFFIC HANDLING CAPACITYIN DATA COMMUNICATION NETWORKS", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS INFORMATION AND COMM. ENG. TOKYO, JP, (19961201), vol. E79-B, no. 12, ISSN 0916-8516, pages 1887 - 1899, XP000692355 [X] 1-5,15-17,26-30 * column 8, line 2 - line 30 * * column 9, line 1 - line 28 * * figure 3 *
 [A]  LIN Y-S ET AL, "A QUEUE MANAGER CHIP FOR SHARED BUFFER ATM SWITCHES", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS INFORMATION AND COMM. ENG. TOKYO, JP, (19961101), vol. E79-B, no. 11, ISSN 0916-8516, pages 1623 - 1631, XP000692326 [A] 1-30 * paragraph [02.1] - paragraph [02.2] * * figures 2-5 *
 [A]  KAWASAKI H ET AL, "A LOW-POWER 128 X 1-BIT GAAS FIFO FOR ATM PACKET SWITCHER", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19961001), vol. 31, no. 10, ISSN 0018-9200, pages 1547 - 1555, XP000638106 [A] 1-30 * column 4, line 14 - line 27 * * column 11, line 20 - line 24 * * column 12, line 1 - line 14 * * figure 2 * * figure 12 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/4.540067