Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1052220

EP1052220 - Equipment for generating ionized gas using high-voltage discharge [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.05.2003
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.06.2003  [2003/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
21 Century Environment Co. Ltd.
1122-10, Ingye-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon
Kyeungi-do / KR
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
21 Century Environment Co. Ltd.
1122-10, Ingye-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon, Kyeungi-do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Yoon, Myung Youl
2nd Floor Chenggye, 898, Yeonsu-dong, Chungju
Chungchengbuk-do / KR
02 / Moon, Chul Soo
Pungsanjangmi Apt. 101-103, 504-16, Mukuri
Kumwang-up, Umseng-gun, Chungchongbuk-do / KR
[2000/46]
Representative(s)Stonehouse, Sidney William
Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham
B16 9PW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]Stonehouse, Sidney William
Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date00303966.611.05.2000
[2000/46]
Priority number, dateKR1999001715513.05.1999         Original published format: KR 9917155
[2000/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1052220
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1052220
Date:05.02.2003
[2003/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.2002
ClassificationInternational:C01B13/11, C02F1/72, B01J19/08
[2000/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/46]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung von ionisiertem Gas mittels Hochspannungsentladung[2000/46]
English:Equipment for generating ionized gas using high-voltage discharge[2000/46]
French:Dispositif de génération d'un gaz ionisé par décharge haute tension[2000/46]
Examination procedure03.12.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/26]
15.01.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/26]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200203   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[PX]WO9925471  (MAXWELL TECHNOLOGIES SYSTEMS D [US]) [PX] 1,5 * page 5, lines 15-24; figures 1,3,4 * * page 8, lines 12-19 * * page 10, lines 21-27 * * page 11, lines 24-31 *;
 [PX]WO9937581  (MOENY WILLIAM M [US], et al) [PX] 1 * page 24, lines 1-9; figures 6,7 * * page 25, lines 11-17 * * page 26, lines 1-12 * * page 31, line 8 *;
 [XA]WO9734643  (OZONE STERILIZATION PRODUCTS I [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * page 10, lines 15-24; figure 1 * * page 10, lines 33,34 * * page 11, lines 19-30 * * page 12, lines 18,19 * * page 14, lines 15-32 * [A] 3,4;
 [XA]US5433832  (RICH STANLEY R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 17; figure 1 * * column 8, lines 8-23 * [A] 3,4;
 [XA]EP0396249  (YU PIN [SG], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, lines 36-42; figure 1 * * column 3, lines 9-21 * [A] 2-5;
 [XA]US4079260  (DMITRIEV ANDREI VLADIMIROVICH, et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, lines 11-21; figure 1 * * column 3, lines 13-21 * [A] 3-5;
 [XA]EP0300452  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,5 * figure 1; example 4 * [A] 3,4;
 [XA]GB2313995  (HSU MAXWELL [TW]) [X] 1,4 * claim 3 * [A] 2,3,5;
 [XA]US5124132  (FRANCIS JR RALPH M [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 32; figure 1 * [A] 3-5;
 [XA]WO9103315  (US COMMERCE [US]) [X] 1,5 * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 18; figures 1,2 * * page 9, lines 31,32 * [A] 2-4