Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1052632

EP1052632 - Optical information recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.04.2008
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd.
1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nagata, Kenichi
12-7, Kaminocho
Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 663-8021 / JP
02 / Yamada, Noboru
1-4-2, Kuzuhaoka
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1104 / JP
[2000/46]
Representative(s)Jeffrey, Philip Michael
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]Jeffrey, Philip Michael
Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date00304046.612.05.2000
[2000/46]
Priority number, dateJP1999013090112.05.1999         Original published format: JP 13090199
[2000/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1052632
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1052632
Date:23.04.2003
[2003/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:G11B7/24
[2000/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/03]
Former [2000/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Optisches Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium[2000/46]
English:Optical information recording medium[2000/46]
French:Support d'enregistrement optique d'informations[2000/46]
Examination procedure03.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/32]
22.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/22]
08.01.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2008/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
27.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
23.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
24.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0810590  (IBM [US]) [X] 1-6,12-14 * page 6, line 2 - page 7, line 29; figure 5 * [Y] 7-11,15,16,20;
 [YA]EP0626682  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 7-11,15,16,20 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,4-6,12-14;
 [A]EP0849729  (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 5; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9913465  (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract *;
 []US6231945  (MIYAMOTO MAKOTO [JP], et al) [ ] * the whole document *