Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1054076

EP1054076 - Gas distribution system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  11.08.2006
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Silicon Valley Group Thermal Systems LLC
440 Kings Valley Road
Scotts Valley, CA 95066 / US
[2000/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Bartholomew, Lawrence D.
181 San Lorenzo Avenue No. 2
Felton, CA 95018 / US
02 / Yuh, Soon K.
133 Navigator Drive
Scotts Valley, CA 95066 / US
03 / Stumbo, Gregory M.
282 Twin Pines Drive
Scotts Valley, CA 95066 / US
04 / King, Mark B.
160 Gaffney Way
Scotts Valley, CA 95066 / US
05 / Chan, Jeffrey
1407 Stanton Way
San Jose, CA 95131 / US
[2000/47]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles , et al
Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP
Essex Place
22 Rodney Road
Cheltenham
Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles , et al
Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham
Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB
Former [2006/31]Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles , et al
Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham
Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB
Former [2002/50]Stoner, Gerard Patrick , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Former [2002/48]Stoner, Gerard Patrick , et al
European Patent Attorney Mewburn Ellis 1 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6NP / GB
Former [2000/47]Allard, Susan Joyce , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date00304070.615.05.2000
[2000/47]
Priority number, dateUS19990134443P17.05.1999         Original published format: US 134443 P
US2000049462031.01.2000         Original published format: US 494620
[2000/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1054076
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1054076
Date:02.04.2003
[2003/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP20.02.2003
ClassificationInternational:C23C16/44, C23C16/455
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2004/01]
Former [2000/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gasverteilungssystem[2000/47]
English:Gas distribution system[2000/47]
French:Système de distribution de gaz[2000/47]
Examination procedure29.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
04.08.2006Application withdrawn by applicant  [2006/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
21.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200506   M06   Fee paid on   21.06.2005
31.05.200607   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YD]US5683516  (DEDONTNEY JAY B [US], et al) [YD] 1-12 * column 4, line 15 - column 6, line 4; figures 4-11 *;
 [YD]US5849088  (DEDONTNEY JAY BRIAN [US], et al) [YD] 1-12 * column 7, line 28 - column 8, line 48; figures 3-6 * * column 10, lines 6-24 *;
 [A]WO9904059  (WATKINS JOHNSON CO [US]) [A] 1-12 * page 8, line 22 - page 11, line 14; figures 4-10 * * page 22, line 24 - page 23, line 14 *;
 [A]EP0365239  (PILKINGTON PLC [GB]) [A] 1-12 * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 53; figures 1,3 *