Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1055903

EP1055903 - Optical techniques for measuring layer thicknesses and other surface characteristics of objects such as semiconductor wafers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.10.2007
Database last updated on 18.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUXTRON CORPORATION
2775 Northwestern Parkway
Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US
[2000/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Schietinger, Charles W.
100 SE Harney Street
Portland Oregon 97202 / US
02 / Hoang, Anh N.
6842 Burnside Drive
San Jose California 95120 / US
[2000/48]
Representative(s)Watkin, Timothy Lawrence Harvey
Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]Watkin, Timothy Lawrence Harvey
Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London, WC1A 1LW / GB
Application number, filing date00304118.316.05.2000
[2000/48]
Priority number, dateUS1999031769724.05.1999         Original published format: US 317697
[2000/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1055903
Date:29.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1055903
Date:20.12.2006
Language:EN
[2006/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01B11/06, G01N21/47, B24B37/04
[2000/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/33]
Former [2000/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Optisches Verfahren zum Messen von Schichtdicken und anderen Oberflächeneigenschaften von Gegenständen wie Halbleiterscheiben[2000/48]
English:Optical techniques for measuring layer thicknesses and other surface characteristics of objects such as semiconductor wafers[2000/48]
French:Procédé optique de mesure d'épaisseur de couches et d'autres propriétés d'objets tels que des plaquettes semiconductrices[2000/48]
Examination procedure10.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/27]
02.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.10.2006Fee for grant paid
09.10.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.09.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
10.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200203   M06   Fee paid on   04.11.2002
31.05.200304   M06   Fee paid on   23.06.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR20.12.2006
IT20.12.2006
[2008/52]
Former [2008/23]IT20.12.2006
FR10.08.2007
Former [2007/35]IT20.12.2006
Documents cited:Search[YA]EP0663265  (IBM [US]) [Y] 1,3,5,6,8,9,19-22,27-29,31,42-45,47 * abstract * * column 5, line 22 - column 6, line 57 * * column 7, line 37 - column 8, line 22 * * column 8, line 26 - line 45 * * column 8, line 56 - column 9, line 2 * * column 9, line 7 - line 40 * * column 11, line 44 - line 54 * * column 12, line 58 - column 13, line 7 * * figures 3,4,6-8 * [A] 24-26,39,41;
 [YA]WO9407110  (LUXTRON CORP [US]) [Y] 1,3,5,6,8,9,19-22,27-29,31,42-45,47 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 21 * * page 27, line 15 - page 28, line 29 * * figure 18 * [A] 38,39;
 [D]US5695660  (LITVAK HERBERT E [US]);
 [A]WO9901745  (LJ LAB LLC [US], et al) [A] 1,22,31,38,44,47 * page 19, line 32 - page 21, line 15 * * figures 4A,4B,4C *;
 [A]WO9923479  (TECHNICAL CHEMICALS & PRODUCTS [US]) [A] 15,18,32,33,37 * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 16 * * page 7, line 14 - line 22 * * page 10, line 30 - page 12, line 3 * * page 18, line 12 - line 21 * * page 23, line 26 - line 27 * * figures 3,6A,11 *;
 [A]EP0735565  (IBM [US], et al) [A] 13,15,18,32-34 * page 4, line 7 - line 27 * * page 6, line 35 - line 39 * * page 6, line 52 - line 57 * * figure 3 *;
 [A]WO9858400  (LUXTRON CORP [US]) [A] 1,22,29,31-34,38,42,44,45,47 * abstract * * page 5, line 7 - line 31 * * page 8, line 34 - page 9, line 14 * * page 10, line 4 - line 5 * * figures 1,2A,2B *;
 [A]US5659397  (MILLER EDGAR R [US], et al) [A] 4,16,23,29,36,40 * column 1, line 8 - line 14 * * column 7, line 41 - line 59 * * figure 1A *;
 [A]GB2009922  (VIANOVA KUNSTHARZ AG) [A] 1-3,12,13,21-23,33,34 * page 3, line 80 - line 86 * * page 3, line 92 - line 98 * * page 3, line 102 - line 105 * * figures 1A,1B,2 *;
 [A]US5475221  (WANG XIAOLU [US]) [A] 14,35 * column A * * column 3, line 56 - line 60 * * figure 5 *