blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1069569

EP1069569 - Data set recovery by codeword overlay [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.07.2006
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.08.2006  [2006/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Former [2001/03]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, California 94304-1112 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Buckingham, Jonathan Peter
14 Davids Close
Alveston, Bristol BS35 3LR / GB
02 / Loredo, Laura
41 Beverley Road
Horfield, Bristol BS7 0JLR / GB
03 / Bartlett, Paul Frederick
44 Lawrence Grove
Henleaze, Bristol BS9 4EJ / GB
 [2001/03]
Representative(s)Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell, et al
Hewlett-Packard Limited
IP Section
Building 3
Filton Road, Stoke Gifford
Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/03]Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell, et al
Hewlett-Packard Limited, IP Section, Building 3, Filton Road
Stoke Gifford, Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB
Application number, filing date00304231.418.05.2000
[2001/03]
Priority number, dateEP1999030507928.06.1999         Original published format: EP 99305079
[2001/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1069569
Date:17.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1069569
Date:01.06.2005
[2005/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.09.2005
ClassificationIPC:G11B20/18
[2001/03]
CPC:
G11B20/1833 (EP); G11B2020/183 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/08]
Former [2001/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Datensatzzurückgewinnung durch Kodewortüberlagerung[2001/03]
English:Data set recovery by codeword overlay[2001/03]
French:Recouvrement d'un paquet de données par superposition de mot de code[2001/03]
Examination procedure06.07.2005Examination requested  [2005/35]
24.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/35]
12.04.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200607   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5251077  (SAITOH SHUICHI [JP]) [Y] 2-11,13,14,16-22,24-26* column 1, line 1 - line 40 *;
 [XY]US5467361  (SHIPMAN JR LLOYD R [US]) [X] 1,12,15,23 * abstract * * column 5, line 38 - line L * [Y] 2-11,13,14,16-22,24-26;
 [X]WO9729486  (OVERLAND DATA INC [US]) [X] 1,12,15,23 * page 5, line 8 - line 16 *;
 [Y]US5818654  (REDDY PRAFULLA B [US], et al) [Y] 2-11,13,14,16-22,24-26 * column 1 * * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.