Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1054568

EP1054568 - Method and apparatus for providing a virtual SS7 link in a commmunications system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.10.2015
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.11.2015  [2015/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel
St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2003/41]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel
St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA
Former [2000/47]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor
Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Krishnamurthy, Shridhar
255 Kailey Way, Coppell
Dallas, Texas 75019 / US
02 / Pathak, Jogen Kanubhai
8200 Southwestern Blvd., Apt 1814
Dallas, Texas 75206 / US
03 / Racz, Steve William
7331 Maplecrest Drive
Dallas, Texas 75240-2728 / US
[2000/47]
Representative(s)Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan , et al
Scott & York
Intellectual Property Limited
45 Grosvenor Road
St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/52]Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan , et al
Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road
St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB
Former [2006/50]Free, Rachel Alder , et al
Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road
St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB
Former [2000/47]Christophers, Rachel Alder , et al
Sommerville & Rushton, Business Link Building, 45 Grosvenor Road
St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB
Application number, filing date00304241.319.05.2000
[2000/47]
Priority number, dateUS1999031517020.05.1999         Original published format: US 315170
[2000/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1054568
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1054568
Date:12.09.2001
[2001/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04Q3/00
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/23]
Former [2000/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Lieferung von virtuellen SS7-Verbindungen in einem Kommunikationssystem[2000/47]
English:Method and apparatus for providing a virtual SS7 link in a commmunications system[2000/47]
French:Méthode et dispositif pour fournir une connexion virtuelle SS7 dans un système de communication[2000/47]
Examination procedure10.10.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/17]
02.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.01.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.06.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/46]
06.07.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/46]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.08.2005
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
29.12.2010Request for further processing filed
29.12.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.01.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
05.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
13.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
20.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
07.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
18.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
22.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
07.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
10.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
19.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
07.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 16
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5870565  (GLITHO ROCH [CA]) [X] 1-10,22-24,27-32,34,35,38-41 * abstract * * column 1, line 44 - line 55 * * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 36 * [Y] 11;
 [XA]WO9828885  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1,4 * column A * * page 2, line 12 - page 3, line 7 * * page 4, line 12 - line 18 * * page 5, line 1 - line 25 * * page 7, line 13 - line 21 * [A] 2,3,5-41;
 [PX]WO9967928  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [PX] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * * page 3, line 16 - page 4, line 17 * * page 5, line 13 - page 6, line 7 * * page 8, line 29 - page 9, line 31 *;
 [Y]EP0203614  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 11 * abstract * * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 12 * * page 6, line 32 - page 7, line 8 *