Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1057567

EP1057567 - ARC welding power supply, ARC welding robot controller, and ARC welding apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/49]ARC welding power supply, peripheral device for ARC welding, and ARC welding apparatus
[2008/33]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.10.2009
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.11.2009  [2009/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2000/49]For all designated states
Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hongu, Toshinori
1-8-7 Komatsu-cho
Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 6638127 / JP
02 / Tsuchiya, Yasuzo
3-1-9-201 Kitamidorigaoka
Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560-0001 / JP
[2000/49]
Representative(s)Crawford, Andrew Birkby , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/49]Crawford, Andrew Birkby , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date00304360.123.05.2000
[2000/49]
Priority number, dateJP1999014446625.05.1999         Original published format: JP 14446699
[2000/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1057567
Date:06.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1057567
Date:02.10.2002
[2002/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1057567
Date:10.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:B23K9/10, B23K9/095
[2002/40]
Former International [2000/49]B23K9/10
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2003/26]
Former [2000/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Lichtbogenschweissversorgung, Lichtbogenschweissrobotsteuergerät, und Lichtbogenschweissgerät[2008/33]
English:ARC welding power supply, ARC welding robot controller, and ARC welding apparatus[2008/33]
French:Alimentation pour soudage à l'arc, controleur du robot du soudage à l'arc, et appareil pour soudage à l'arc[2008/33]
Former [2000/49]Lichtbogenschweissversorgung, Peripheriegerät zum Lichtbogenschweissen, und Lichtbogenschweissgerät
Former [2000/49]ARC welding power supply, peripheral device for ARC welding, and ARC welding apparatus
Former [2000/49]Alimentation pour soudage à l'arc, organe périphérique pour soudage à l'arc, et appareil pour soudage à l'arc
Examination procedure04.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/05]
31.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2008Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.07.2008
04.07.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
08.07.2008Date of oral proceedings
08.07.2008Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
05.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2008Fee for grant paid
24.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.09.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
13.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
23.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]US5571431  (LANTIERI LOUIS T [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4883938  (SARUGAKU SHINICHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *;
 [XY]EP0911107  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4 * the whole document * [Y] 7-11;
 [XY]EP0865858  (YASKAWA DENKI SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * [Y] 7-11;
 [A]JPH0985443
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 1997, no. 07, [A] 1-11 * abstract *