Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1055657

EP1055657 - Method of refining dihydroxyaryl compound [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.03.2004  [2004/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ube Industries, Ltd.
12-32, Nishi-honmachi 1-chome
Ube-shi
Yamaguchi-prefecture / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]For all designated states
Ube Industries, Ltd.
12-32, Nishi-honmachi 1-chome
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-prefecture / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tanaka, Shuji, Ube Chemical Factory
Ube Industries Ltd., 1978-10, Oaza Kogushi
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi / JP
02 / Kofuji, Hiroshi, Ube Chemical Factory
Ube Industries Ltd., 1978-10, Oaza Kogushi
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi / JP
03 / Koga, Genji, Ube Chemical Factory
Ube Industries Ltd., 1978-10, Oaza Kogushi
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi / JP
04 / Kawashita, Tetsuro, Ube Chemical Factory
Ube Industries Ltd., 1978-10, Oaza Kogushi
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi / JP
[2000/48]
Representative(s)Harrison, Ivor Stanley , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]Harrison, Ivor Stanley , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date00304393.224.05.2000
[2000/48]
Priority number, dateJP1999014456225.05.1999         Original published format: JP 14456299
[2000/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1055657
Date:29.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1055657
Date:02.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07C39/08, C07C39/24, C07C37/74
[2000/48]
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT [2001/33]
Former [2000/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Raffinierung von Dihydroxyaryl Verbindungen[2000/48]
English:Method of refining dihydroxyaryl compound[2000/48]
French:Procédé de raffinage de composés dihydroxyaryles[2000/48]
Examination procedure27.12.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/11]
23.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.01.2003Fee for grant paid
24.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0022534  (BAYER AG [DE])