Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1059231

EP1059231 - Solar array control for a satellite with an electric propulsion system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 10.09.2003  [2003/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Space Systems / Loral, Inc.
3825 Fabian Way Palo Alto
California 94303 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/50]For all designated states
SPACE SYSTEMS / LORAL, INC.
3825 Fabian Way
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Tilley, Scott W.
26217 Dori Lane
Los Altos, California 94022 / US
02 / Gelon, Walter
622 Island Place
Redwood City, California 94065 / US
[2000/50]
Representative(s)Ertl, Nicholas Justin , et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/17]Ertl, Nicholas Justin , et al
Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2002/05]Exell, Jonathan Mark , et al
Elkington & Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2000/52]Ertl, Nicholas Justin , et al
Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2000/50]Finnie, Peter John
Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date00304418.716.05.2000
[2000/50]
Priority number, dateUS1999032809108.06.1999         Original published format: US 328091
[2000/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1059231
Date:13.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1059231
Date:05.09.2001
[2001/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:B64G1/24, B64G1/26, B64G1/44, G05D1/08
[2001/36]
Former International [2000/50]B64G1/24, B64G1/26, B64G1/44
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/21]
Former [2000/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Steuerung der Solarzellenausleger für einen Satelliten mit einem elektrischem Antriebssystem[2000/50]
English:Solar array control for a satellite with an electric propulsion system[2000/50]
French:Contrôle des panneaux solaires sur un satellite à propulsion électrique[2000/50]
Examination procedure21.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/03]
09.07.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DYA]US5716029  (SPITZER ARNON [US], et al) [DY] 3 * column 1 - column 3, line 63 * * column 5, line 46 - column 6, line 23 * [A] 1,2,4,9-15;
 [YA]EP0799768  (EUROP PROPULSION [FR]) [Y] 4 * abstract * * column 17, line 52 - column 21, line 41 * * figures 7,8 * [A] 1-3,5-7,10-15;
 [XAY]  HERMEL J ET AL, "MODULAR, ION-PROPELLED, ORBIT-TRANSFER VEHICLE", JOURNAL OF SPACECRAFT AND ROCKETS,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF AERONAUTICS AND ASTRONAUTICS. NEW YORK,US, (19880901), vol. 25, no. 5, ISSN 0022-4650, pages 368 - 374, XP000030180 [X] 1,2,5,7,8 * page 368, column 2, paragraph L - page 369, column 1, paragraph L * * page 370, column 2, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * page 371, column 1, line 1 - line 2 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 9-11,15 [Y] 3,4,6
 [YA]  OGLEVIE R E, ANDREWS P D, JASPER T P, Attitude Control Requirements for an Earth-Orbital Solar Electric Propulsion Stage, NY, USA, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF AERONAUTICS AND ASTRONAUTICS, XP002940535 [Y] 6 * page 1, column 1, line 1 - page 2, column 1, paragraph 1; figure 1 * * page 6, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 9, column 1 * [A] 1,2,5,7,8,10,11,14,15
 [A]  OLESON S R ET AL, "ADVANCED PROPULSION FOR GEOSTATIONARY ORBIT INSERTION AND NORTH-SOUTH STATION KEEPING", JOURNAL OF SPACECRAFT AND ROCKETS,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF AERONAUTICS AND ASTRONAUTICS. NEW YORK,US, (1997), vol. 34, no. 1, ISSN 0022-4650, pages 22 - 28, XP000693630 [A] 1-3,5,7,9-12,14,15 * page 22 - page 24 *
 [A]  JENKIN A B, "Attitude Maneuvers of a Solar-Powered Electric Orbital Transfer Vehicle", ADVANCES IN THE ASTRONAUTICAL SCIENCES, (1991), vol. 76, no. 1, pages 723 - 742, XP002940537 [A] 1,2,5-7,10,11,14,15 * page 723 - page 725, paragraph 1 * * page 739, paragraph 2 - page 741 *
 [A]  PORTE F ET AL, "BENEFITS OF ELECTRIC PROPULSION FOR ORBIT INJECTION OF COMMUNICATION SPACECRAFT", INTERNATIONAL COMMUNICATION SATELLITE SYSTEMS CONFERENCE AND EXHIBIT,XX,XX, (19920322), pages 1 - 9, XP002020397 [A] 1-3,10-12 * page 2, column 2, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 *
by applicantUS5716029