EP1059791 - Apparatus, and associated method, for identifying data with an address [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2000/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mikkonen, Jouni Kaaponkuja 3 A 4 33820 Tampere / FI | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00304491.4 | 26.05.2000 | [2000/50] | Priority number, date | US19990322462 | 28.05.1999 Original published format: US 322462 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1059791 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1059791 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | [2002/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/12 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
H04W8/26 (EP,US);
H04L61/5084 (EP,US);
H04L61/5092 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04W80/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2002/41] |
Former [2000/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Identifizierung von Daten mit einer Adresse | [2000/50] | English: | Apparatus, and associated method, for identifying data with an address | [2000/50] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour identifier des données avec une adresse | [2000/50] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 24.07.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE | 25.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/24] | 07.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/24] | Request for further processing for: | 25.06.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 25.06.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.08.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.08.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9815106 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1,2,13-15 * abstract * * the whole document *[A] 3-12,16-20; | [XY]WO9857474 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR], et al) [X] 1-8,13-20 * abstract * * page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 1 * * page 7, line 23 - page 7, line 25 * * page 8, line 5 - page 8, line 10 * * page 13, line 2 - page 13, line 11; figures 1,2; claim 5 * [Y] 9-12; | [DY] - PERKINS C, "RFC 2002: IP Mobility Support", RFC 2002, (199610), XP002123919 [DY] 9-12 * abstract * * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 27 * * page 8, line 5 - page 9, line 37 * |