Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1058262

EP1058262 - Encoding and multiplexing of video streams [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.04.2014
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.04.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.05.2014  [2014/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/49]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kato, Motoki
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP
02 / Obata, Koji
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP
03 / Igi, Nobuhiro
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP
04 / Takashima, Yoshikazu
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP
[2000/49]
Representative(s)Turner, James Arthur , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/51]Turner, James Arthur , et al
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2000/49]Pratt, Richard Wilson , et al
D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date00304570.530.05.2000
[2000/49]
Priority number, dateJP1999015440201.06.1999         Original published format: JP 15440299
JP2000009076927.03.2000         Original published format: JP 2000090769
[2000/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1058262
Date:06.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1058262
Date:21.04.2004
[2004/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP10.03.2004
ClassificationInternational:G11B27/034, H04N5/926, H04N9/804
[2000/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/02]
Former [2000/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kodierung und Multiplexierung von Videoströmen[2000/49]
English:Encoding and multiplexing of video streams[2000/49]
French:Codage et multiplexage de flux de données vidéo[2000/49]
Examination procedure13.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/46]
05.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/21]
13.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2014/21]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.04.2005
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
13.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
23.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
24.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201314   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XP]EP0935395  (SONY CORP [JP]) [XP] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9905864  (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,10,12,14-17;
 []EP0923243  (SONY CORP [JP]) [ ] * paragraphs [0013] , [0044] , [0063] , [0068] , [0100] - [0126]; figures 19,27-30 *;
 [X]  - WEE S J ET AL, "SPLICING MPEG VIDEO STREAMS IN THE COMPRESSED DOMAIN", IEEE WORKSHOP ON MULTIMEDIA SIGNAL PROCESSING. PROCEEDINGS OF SIGNAL PROCESSING SOCIETY WORKSHOP ON MULTIMEDIA SIGNAL PROCESSING, XX, XX, (19970623), pages 225 - 230, XP000957700 [X] 1-17 * page 227, line 18 - line 22 * * page 229, line 33 - line 41 * * page 226, line 11 - line 13 *
 [A]  - HURST N ET AL, "MPEG SPLICING: A NEW STANDARD FOR TELEVISION - SMPTE 312M", SMPTE JOURNAL, SMPTE INC. SCARSDALE, N.Y, US, (199811), vol. 107, no. 11, ISSN 0036-1682, pages 978 - 988, XP000804761 [A] 1-17 * the whole document *