blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1070776 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1070776



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 101
28.01.2004 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
24.09.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
04.07.2003 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
30.06.2003 Invitation to pay examination fee/designation fees with additional fee Search / examination 1
14.02.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
25.11.2002 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
04.10.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
04.10.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.10.2002 European search report Search / examination 1
06.09.2002 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
22.12.2000 Drawings Search / examination 12
22.12.2000 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
22.12.2000 Translation of priority document Search / examination 22
13.12.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
17.11.2000 Claims Search / examination 3
17.11.2000 Description Search / examination 7
17.11.2000 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
27.09.2000 Invitation to remedy deficiencies in application documents Search / examination 2
04.08.2000 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2000 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
25.07.2000 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
03.07.2000 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.06.2000 Drawings Search / examination 9
29.06.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
31.05.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
31.05.2000 Claims Search / examination 3
31.05.2000 Description Search / examination 7
31.05.2000 Drawings Search / examination 9
31.05.2000 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7