blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1070776


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.01.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  17.03.2004  [2004/12]
22.10.2003 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
22.10.2003 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
18.09.2003 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
02.07.2003 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
24.06.2003 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
24.06.2003 Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973)
20.06.2003 Definitive list of designations published on  06.08.2003  [2003/32]
04.10.2002 Publication of search report published on  20.11.2002  [2002/47]
28.05.2002 Renewal fee
08.12.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.01.2001 [2001/04]