Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1070776

EP1070776 - Knitting machine for and method of knitting high density fabrics [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.01.2004
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.03.2004  [2004/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Precision Fukuhara Works, Ltd.
1-5, Honjo-cho 1-chome, Higashinada-ku Kobe
Hyogo 658-0012 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/04]For all designated states
Precision Fukuhara Works, Ltd.
1-5, Honjo-cho 1-chome, Higashinada-ku
Kobe, Hyogo 658-0012 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shibata, Takao
2-25 Tenno-cho, Takatsuki
Osaka 569-0088 / JP
 [2001/04]
Representative(s)Warren, Keith Stanley , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
Cambridge House
100 Cambridge Grove
Hammersmith, London
W6 0LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/04]Warren, Keith Stanley , et al
BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington
London W8 5BU / GB
Application number, filing date00304594.531.05.2000
[2001/04]
Priority number, dateJP1999015109331.05.1999         Original published format: JP 15109399
[2001/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1070776
Date:24.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1070776
Date:20.11.2002
[2002/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:D04B1/00, D04B9/06
[2001/04]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/32]
Former [2001/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Strickmaschine und Verfahren zum Stricken von Waren mit hoher Maschendichte[2001/04]
English:Knitting machine for and method of knitting high density fabrics[2001/04]
French:Métier à tricoter et procédé pour la fabrication d'articles à haute densité[2001/04]
Examination procedure21.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/12]
24.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
30.06.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
30.06.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2111476  (HARRY MCADAMS) [X] 1-3 * page 3, column 1, lines 15-32; figures 2-5 * * page 1, column 2, lines 30-34 * * page 2, column 1, lines 16-20 * * page 3, column 1, lines 36-50 * [A] 4,13;
 [A]GB478046  (HEMPHILL CO) [A] 1,4,6,13 * page 1, lines 41-43 * * page 1, line 99 - page 2, line 23 * * page 1, lines 51-64 * * page 2, lines 53-72 * * page 2, lines 106-115 *;
 [A]US2164337  (HARRY MCADAMS) [A] 4-13 * page 3, column 2, lines 6-20 * * page 5, column 2, lines 40-44; figure 11 * * page 6, column 1, lines 29-38 * * page 7, column 1, lines 45-52 * * page 10, column 1, lines 54-61 *