Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1061195

EP1061195 - Device for the transfer of loads from floors to columns [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.03.2005
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Horton, Brian
20 Tadorne Road Tadworth
Surrey KT20 5TD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/51]For all designated states
Horton, Brian
20 Tadorne Road
Tadworth, Surrey KT20 5TD / GB
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/51]
Representative(s)Pedder, James Cuthbert , et al
Regent House
1-3 Queensway
Redhill
Surrey RH1 1QT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/51]Pedder, James Cuthbert , et al
Barlin Associates, Barlin House, 50 Throwley Way
Sutton, Surrey SM1 4BF / GB
Application number, filing date00304613.322.05.2000
[2000/51]
Priority number, dateGB1999001399417.06.1999         Original published format: GB 9913994
[2000/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1061195
Date:20.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1061195
Date:12.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:E04B5/43
[2000/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2004/15]
Former [2000/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Übertragung von Lasten von Decken zu Säulen[2000/51]
English:Device for the transfer of loads from floors to columns[2000/51]
French:Dispositif pour le transfert de charges d'un plancher à un pilier[2000/51]
Examination procedure07.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/33]
24.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.2004Fee for grant paid
26.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.05.2004
BE12.05.2004
CH12.05.2004
CY12.05.2004
ES12.05.2004
FI12.05.2004
FR12.05.2004
IT12.05.2004
LI12.05.2004
NL12.05.2004
LU22.05.2004
IE24.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK12.08.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
PT12.10.2004
DE01.12.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/35]AT12.05.2004
BE12.05.2004
CH12.05.2004
CY12.05.2004
ES12.05.2004
FI12.05.2004
FR12.05.2004
IT12.05.2004
LI12.05.2004
NL12.05.2004
LU22.05.2004
IE24.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK12.08.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
DE01.12.2004
Former [2007/08]AT12.05.2004
BE12.05.2004
CH12.05.2004
CY12.05.2004
ES12.05.2004
FI12.05.2004
FR12.05.2004
LI12.05.2004
NL12.05.2004
LU22.05.2004
IE24.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK12.08.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
DE01.12.2004
Former [2006/14]AT12.05.2004
BE12.05.2004
CH12.05.2004
FI12.05.2004
FR12.05.2004
LI12.05.2004
NL12.05.2004
LU22.05.2004
IE24.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK12.08.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
DE01.12.2004
Former [2006/13]AT12.05.2004
BE12.05.2004
CH12.05.2004
FI12.05.2004
LI12.05.2004
NL12.05.2004
LU22.05.2004
IE24.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK12.08.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
DE01.12.2004
Former [2005/30]AT12.05.2004
BE12.05.2004
CH12.05.2004
FI12.05.2004
LI12.05.2004
LU22.05.2004
IE24.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK12.08.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
DE01.12.2004
Former [2005/24]AT12.05.2004
BE12.05.2004
CH12.05.2004
FI12.05.2004
LI12.05.2004
LU22.05.2004
IE24.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK12.08.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
Former [2005/23]AT12.05.2004
BE12.05.2004
CH12.05.2004
FI12.05.2004
LI12.05.2004
LU22.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK12.08.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
Former [2005/18]AT12.05.2004
BE12.05.2004
CH12.05.2004
FI12.05.2004
LI12.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK12.08.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
Former [2005/14]AT12.05.2004
BE12.05.2004
CH12.05.2004
FI12.05.2004
LI12.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
Former [2005/11]AT12.05.2004
CH12.05.2004
FI12.05.2004
LI12.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
Former [2005/06]CH12.05.2004
FI12.05.2004
LI12.05.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
Former [2005/02]CH12.05.2004
FI12.05.2004
LI12.05.2004
SE12.08.2004
Former [2004/52]CH12.05.2004
LI12.05.2004
SE12.08.2004
Former [2004/51]CH12.05.2004
LI12.05.2004
Documents cited:Search[XA]US1461892  (CONEY FRANKLIN H) [X] 1-4,7-9 * the whole document * [A] 5,6,10,11;
 [XA]US1329614  (JOHN LALLY) [X] 1,8-10 * the whole document * [A] 2-7,11;
 [A]US2768520  (STREHAN GEORGE E) [A] 1,7 * column 2, paragraph L; figure - *;
 [A]FR1263369  (PIERRE) [A] 1,8,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR438950  (ROBERT THOMSON [GB]) [A] 1,8 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0557731  (DALSBRUK OY AB [FI]) [A] 1,8 * abstract *;
 [A]US1536942  (SKAER) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2626407  (POLLEHN HORST WALTER) [A] 1,6,11 * figures 1,10-13 *