EP1059812 - Methods and apparatus for context-based inter/intra coding mode selection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Faryar, Alireza Farid 30 Laury Drive Fair Haven, New Jersey 07704 / US | 02 /
Sen, Moushumi 385 Ocean Boulevard, Apt. 2P West End New Jersey 07740 / US | 03 /
Yang, Kyeong Ho 8 Hawthorne Court Freehold, New Jersey 07728 / US | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2005/25] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [2000/50] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies Inc., 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00304632.3 | 31.05.2000 | [2000/50] | Priority number, date | US19990326872 | 07.06.1999 Original published format: US 326872 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1059812 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1059812 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | [2003/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1059812 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26, H04N7/50, H04N7/34 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
H04N19/507 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/50] | H04N7/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/30] |
Former [2000/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur kontextbasierten Inter/Intra Kodierungsmodeauswahl | [2005/51] | English: | Methods and apparatus for context-based inter/intra coding mode selection | [2000/50] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de sélection de mode de codage intra/inter à l'aide d'information contextuelle | [2000/50] |
Former [2000/50] | Verfahren und Vorichtung zur kontextbasierten Inter/Intra Kodierungsmodeauswahl | Examination procedure | 19.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 25.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA] - WU X ET AL, "Lossless interframe image compression via context modeling", DATA COMPRESSION CONFERENCE, 1998. DCC '98. PROCEEDINGS SNOWBIRD, UT, USA 30 MARCH-1 APRIL 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19980330), ISBN 0-8186-8406-2, pages 378 - 387, XP010276574 [X] 1-6,9,10,13-18,21,22,25 * page 378 - page 381, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 * [A] 7,8,11,12,19,20,23,24 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DCC.1998.672169 | [A] - WU X ET AL, "Context-based, adaptive, lossless image coding", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, APRIL 1997, IEEE, USA, vol. 45, no. 4, ISSN 0090-6778, pages 437 - 444, XP002214730 [A] 1-25 * page 438 - page 439, paragraph III * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.585919 | [A] - ADJEROK D A ET AL, "Adaptive transform domain video scene analysis", MULTIMEDIA COMPUTING AND SYSTEMS '97. PROCEEDINGS., IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON OTTAWA, ONT., CANADA 3-6 JUNE 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19970603), ISBN 0-8186-7819-4, pages 203 - 210, XP010239190 [A] 1-25 * page 204, right column, paragraph "Neighbourhood Differences" * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MMCS.1997.609594 |