EP1059261 - Safety stirrup [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastwest International (Taiwan) Enterprises 21F No. 447, Sec. 3, Wen-Shin Road Taichung Taiwan / CN | [2006/42] |
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states Eastwest International (Taiwan) Enterprises 21F No. 447, Sec. 3, Wen-Shin Road Taichung, Taiwan / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hsi-Chang, Chang 21F No. 447, Sec. 3, Wen-Shin Road Taichung, Taiwan / CN | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | Phillips, Patricia Marie, et al Wilson Gunn M'Caw, 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street Manchester M2 7BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00304717.2 | 02.06.2000 | [2000/50] | Priority number, date | US19990326834 | 07.06.1999 Original published format: US 326834 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1059261 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1059261 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | [2002/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1059261 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B68C3/02 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
B68C3/025 (EP,US);
B68C2003/0008 (EP,US);
B68C2003/0041 (EP,US);
B68C2003/0091 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/50] | Title | German: | Sicherheitssteigbügel | [2000/50] | English: | Safety stirrup | [2000/50] | French: | Etrier de sécurité | [2000/50] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 01.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.10.2006 | CH | 18.10.2006 | CY | 18.10.2006 | FI | 18.10.2006 | LI | 18.10.2006 | DK | 18.01.2007 | SE | 18.01.2007 | GR | 19.01.2007 | ES | 29.01.2007 | PT | 19.03.2007 | IE | 04.06.2007 | MC | 30.06.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2008/25] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
CH | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
LI | 18.10.2006 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
GR | 19.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
IE | 04.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
CH | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
LI | 18.10.2006 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
GR | 19.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
CH | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
LI | 18.10.2006 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
CH | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
LI | 18.10.2006 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
CH | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
LI | 18.10.2006 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
CH | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
LI | 18.10.2006 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
CH | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
LI | 18.10.2006 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 18.10.2006 | |
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 18.10.2006 | |
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | ES | 29.01.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US365238 (CARDELL WILLIAM SAMUEL) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [XA]WO9525692 (REA PHILIP LESLIE [GB]) [X] 1,3,13 * page 11, line 14 - line 19; figures 6-9 * [A] 5; | [A]US5598687 (HESTER DANIEL L [US]) [A] 14* column 4, line 29 - line 37; figure 4 *; | [A]DE19735211 (MEROTH ERWIN [DE]) [A] 4 * figure 1 *; | [PXA]FR2786174 (COURAUD JEAN CLAUDE [FR]) [PX] 1,3,13 * page 2, line 10 - line 12; figure 2 * [PA] 14 | Examination | WO0030972 |