Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1069668

EP1069668 - A winding for switched reluctance machines [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.07.2006
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.08.2006  [2006/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SWITCHED RELUCTANCE DRIVES LIMITED
East Park House, Otley Road Harrogate
North Yorkshire HG3 1PR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/35]For all designated states
SWITCHED RELUCTANCE DRIVES LIMITED
East Park House, Otley Road Harrogate
North Yorkshire HG3 1PR / GB
Former [2001/03]For all designated states
SWITCHED RELUCTANCE DRIVES LIMITED
East Park House, Otley Road
Harrogate, North Yorkshire HG3 1PR / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Randall, Steven Paul
40 St.Helen's Lane
Leeds, LS6 8BS / GB
 [2001/03]
Representative(s)Hale, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/03]Hale, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date00304867.508.06.2000
[2001/03]
Priority number, dateGB1999001679716.07.1999         Original published format: GB 9916797
[2001/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1069668
Date:17.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1069668
Date:18.06.2003
[2003/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1069668
Date:31.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:H02K3/18, H02K11/04
[2001/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/11]
Former [2001/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Wicklungsanordnung für eine geschaltete Reluktanzmaschine[2005/07]
English:A winding for switched reluctance machines[2001/03]
French:Configuration d'enroulement pour une machine à reluctance commutée[2001/03]
Former [2001/03]Wicklungsanordnung für einen auf eine geschaltete Reluktanzmaschine
Examination procedure02.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/05]
19.12.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.04.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
03.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.04.2005Fee for grant paid
11.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
26.01.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
26.01.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
26.01.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
26.01.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
26.01.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
26.01.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
26.01.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
26.01.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
26.01.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
26.01.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
26.01.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
26.01.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
26.01.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
26.01.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5731645  (CLIFTON DAVID B [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-9 * column 6, line 42 - column 11, line 7; examples 2-6 * [A] 5,12,14,15;
 [A]JPH01107630  ;
 [A]GB2240664  (SMITH & NEPHEW [GB], et al) [A] 1,3,12 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3366812  (SUMMERFIELD DAVID N) [A] 1,2,7,9,12,14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5161361  (TALLEY PERRY E [US], et al) [A] 1,3,5,12,15 * column 3, line 50 - column 5, line 59; figures 2-4 *;
 [A]JPH06245440
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890804), vol. 013, no. 348, Database accession no. (E - 799), [A] 3,4,15 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941205), vol. 018, no. 635, Database accession no. (E - 1638), [A] 1,2,7-9 * abstract *