Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1061554
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
21.05.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] |
03.02.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
31.07.2003 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
13.12.2002 |
Change - priority |
published on 29.01.2003 [2003/05] |
11.06.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.02.2002 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
22.11.2001 |
Change - extension states |
|
15.10.2001 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
25.07.2001 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
20.07.2001 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] |
03.11.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] |
03.11.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] |