Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1061554

EP1061554 - White light source using carbon nanotubes and fabrication method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.05.2004
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.07.2004  [2004/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Iljin Nanotech Co., Ltd.
50-1 Dohwa-dong, Mapo-gu
Seoul / KR
For all designated states
Lee, Cheol-jin
304-1004 Hyundai 3-cha Apt., Naun 2-dong Gunsan-city
Jeonlabuk-do / KR
[N/P]
Former [2000/51]For all designated states
Iljin Nanotech Co., Ltd.
50-1 Dohwa-dong, Mapo-gu
Seoul / KR
For all designated states
Lee, Cheol-jin
304-1004 Hyundai 3-cha Apt., Naun 2-dong
Gunsan-city, Jeonlabuk-do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Cheol-Jin
304-1004 Hyundai 3-cha Apt., Naun 2-dong
Gunsan-city, Jeonlabuk-do / KR
02 / Yoo, Jae-Eun
106-1001 Kyungnam Apt., 1015 Jeongreung 1-dong
Seongbuk-gu, Seoul / KR
[2000/51]
Representative(s)Stuttard, Garry Philip
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Arena Point
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/51]Stuttard, Garry Philip
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date00304889.909.06.2000
[2000/51]
Priority number, dateKR1999002241515.06.1999         Original published format: KR 9922415
KR1999002304718.06.1999         Original published format: KR 9923047
KR2000003035502.06.2000         Original published format: KR 2000030355
[2003/05]
Former [2000/51]KR1999002241515.06.1999
KR1999002304718.06.1999
KR2000003035502.06.2000
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1061554
Date:20.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01J63/06, H01J9/24
[2000/51]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/36]
Former [2000/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Weisslichtquelle mit Kohlenstoffnanoröhren und Verfahren zur Herstellung[2000/51]
English:White light source using carbon nanotubes and fabrication method thereof[2000/51]
French:Source de lumière blanche à nanotubes de carbone et procédé de fabrication[2000/51]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
16.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/51]
21.06.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
18.10.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE
03.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/28]
05.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
31.07.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
31.07.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
31.07.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
31.07.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
31.07.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
31.07.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
31.07.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
31.07.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
31.07.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
31.07.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
31.07.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
31.07.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
31.07.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0913508  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,3,5,7,10,14,16-18 * column 1, lines 19-21; claims 1-36 *;
 [A]WO9707531  (DU PONT [US], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-13 *;
 [A]US5773921  (KEESMANN TILL [DE], et al) [A] 1,5,7 * column 6, lines 52-56; claims 1-8 *;
 [A]WO9844526  (CANDESCENT TECH CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * claims 1,9,22 *;
 [A]DE19602595  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]);
 [PA]US6019656  (PARK KANG HO [KR], et al) [PA] 10 * claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9428571  (MICROELECTRONICS & COMPUTER [US]) [A] 1 * claim 30 *;
 [A]EP0351110  (EMI PLC THORN [GB]) [A] 1,10 * claims 1-12 *;
 [A]WO9718577  (DU PONT [US], et al) [A] 10 * claims 1-14 *;
 [PA]WO9966523  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [PA] 1 *ABSTRACT*;
 [PA]EP0989579  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [PA] 1,7,10,18 * claims 1-21 *;
 [A]EP0905737  (ISE ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]) [A] 1,10 * column 8, lines 33-47; claims 1-18 *