Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1059525

EP1059525 - Oxygen sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.08.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR, GB
published on 06.09.2017  [2017/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD.
14-18, Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP
[2015/36]
Former [2000/50]For all designated states
NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD
14-18, Takatsuji-cho
Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Akatsuka, Shoji
c/o NGK Spark Plug Co.,Ltd.
14-18 Takatsuji-cho
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya, Aichi / JP
02 / Ishikawa, Satoshi
c/o NGK Spark Plug Co.,Ltd.
14-18 Takatsuji-cho
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya, Aichi / JP
 [2015/33]
Former [2000/50]01 / Akatsuka, Shoji, c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd.
14-18 Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya, Aichi / JP
02 / Ishikawa, Satoshi, c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd.
14-18 Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya, Aichi / JP
Representative(s)Nicholls, Michael John
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[2016/01]
Former [2000/50]Nicholls, Michael John
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date00304933.509.06.2000
[2000/50]
Priority number, dateJP1999016581911.06.1999         Original published format: JP 16581999
JP2000004483622.02.2000         Original published format: JP 2000044836
[2000/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1059525
Date:13.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1059525
Date:06.10.2004
[2004/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1059525
Date:06.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.08.2004
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/407, G01N27/406
[2004/41]
Former International [2000/50]G01N27/407
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2016/01]
Former [2005/26]DE,  FR,  GB,  IT 
Former [2000/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Sauerstoffsensor[2000/50]
English:Oxygen sensor[2000/50]
French:Capteur d'oxygène[2000/50]
Examination procedure04.04.2005Examination requested  [2005/22]
22.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.11.2015Fee for grant paid
12.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.11.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.02.2006
Opposition(s)07.10.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
14.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
10.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 16
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT06.01.2016
GB09.06.2016
FR30.06.2016
[2017/26]
Former [2016/36]IT06.01.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0811840  (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [X] 1-3,5 * page 8, line 9 - page 10, line 38; figures 1,6-10 *;
 [X]US5759365  (YAMADA HIROKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8 * abstract * * column 5, line 18 - column 9, line 7 *;
 [X]EP0899562  (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0027] - [0034] - [0091] - [0103]; figures 1,3,26,27,35,36,38 *;
 [X]EP0313214  (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * columns 6-10 *;
 [X]DE19702096  (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * column 13, line 53 - column 20, line 14; figures 1-13 *;
 [A]DE9401859U  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0496136  (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0886138  (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *