Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1096744

EP1096744 - Electronic mail system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.03.2010
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.03.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.04.2010  [2010/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/18]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Miyazawa, Yoshinori
Fujitsu Pers. Comp. Syst. Ltd, 1405, Ooaza, Oomaru
Inagi-shi, Tokyo / JP
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Hitching, Peter Matthew , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London
WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]Hitching, Peter Matthew , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date00304938.409.06.2000
[2001/18]
Priority number, dateJP1999030254825.10.1999         Original published format: JP 30254899
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1096744
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1096744
Date:30.05.2007
[2007/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1096744
Date:29.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.07.2006
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/00, H04L12/58
[2007/22]
Former International [2001/18]H04L12/58, H04L12/18
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2008/06]
Former [2001/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektronisches Postsystem[2001/18]
English:Electronic mail system[2001/18]
French:Système de courrier électronique[2001/18]
Examination procedure15.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.03.2009Fee for grant paid
18.03.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP08163504.7  / EP2001181
Opposition(s)01.02.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
29.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
26.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5872925  (HAN CHARLES S [US]) [X] 1-4,6-10,12-16,18-20 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 8 * * column 4, line 13 - line 55 * [Y] 5,11,17;
 [YA]EP0855640  (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 5,11,17 * column 4, line 45 - line 54; figure 67 * * column 42, line 9 - line 27 * [A] 1-4,6-10,12-16,18-20;
 [A]EP0721268  (IBM [US]) [A] 1-20 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 23 * * column 3, line 49 - line 58 * * column 4, line 23 - line 34 * * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 26 * * figure 6 *;
 [A]JPH0830524
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 1996, no. 06, [A] 1-20 * abstract *