Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1068996

EP1068996 - Cover for a vehicle storage compartment [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.05.2002
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.07.2002  [2002/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MG Rover Group Limited
International Headquarters, P.O. Box 41 Longbridge
Birmingham B31 2TB / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
MG Rover Group Limited
International Headquarters, P.O. Box 41
Longbridge, Birmingham B31 2TB / GB
Former [2001/03]For all designated states
ROVER GROUP LIMITED
International Headquarters, Warwick Technology Park
Warwick, Warwickshire CV34 6RG / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Sanghera, Rashpal Singh
1 Tybalt Close, Warwick Gates
Warwick, CV34 6XB / GB
02 / Douglas, Graham John York House
The Courtyarrd, Glasshouse Lane
Kenilworth, Warks., CV8 2AH / GB
 [2001/03]
Representative(s)Watts, Peter Graham , et al
Anthony Cundy & Co.
39/41 South Drive
Sutton Coldfield
West Midlands B75 7TE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]Watts, Peter Graham , et al
Anthony Cundy & Co., 1 Olton Bridge, 245 Warwick Road
Solihull, West Midlands B92 7AH / GB
Former [2001/03]Parnham, Kevin , et al
Rover Group Limited, Patent Department, Gaydon Test Centre, Banbury Road
Lighthorne, Warwick CV35 0RG / GB
Application number, filing date00305082.015.06.2000
[2001/03]
Priority number, dateGB1999001648815.07.1999         Original published format: GB 9916488
[2001/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1068996
Date:17.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1068996
Date:07.02.2001
[2001/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60R5/04, B62D43/10
[2001/03]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/43]
Former [2001/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Abdeckung für Ablagen eines Kraftfahrzeugs[2001/03]
English:Cover for a vehicle storage compartment[2001/03]
French:Couvercle pour réceptacle de véhicule[2001/03]
Examination procedure08.08.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/29]
24.01.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/29]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
04.10.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
04.10.2001M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2733731  (PEUGEOT [FR]) [X] 1-6,9 * abstract *;
 [PA]JPH11217088  ;
 [A]JPS5926373  ;
 [A]JPS58188763
 [PA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991130), vol. 1999, no. 13, [PA] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840606), vol. 008, no. 120, Database accession no. (M - 300), [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840210), vol. 008, no. 032, Database accession no. (M - 275), [A] * abstract *