EP1061640 - A method and apparatus for energizing stator windings of a rotating electromagnetic machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. 8000 W. Florissant Avenue P.O. Box 4100 St. Louis Missouri 63136 / US | [2007/41] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. 8000 W. Florissant Avenue P.O. Box 4100 St. Louis Missouri 63136 / US | ||
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states SWITCHED RELUCTANCE DRIVES LIMITED East Park House, Otley Road Harrogate, North Yorkshire HG3 1PR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marcinkiewicz, Joseph Gerald 136 Roehampton Lane St. Charles, MO 63304 / US | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Hale, Peter, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | Hale, Peter, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00305149.7 | 19.06.2000 | [2000/51] | Priority number, date | US19990139703 | 17.06.1999 Original published format: US 139703 | US19990459543 | 14.12.1999 Original published format: US 459543 | [2000/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1061640 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1061640 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | [2004/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1061640 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1061640 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/10, H02K29/03 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
H02P6/10 (EP,KR,US);
H02P2205/01 (KR);
Y10S388/9281 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2000/51] | H02P6/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestromung der Statorwindungen einer drehenden elektrischen Maschine | [2000/51] | English: | A method and apparatus for energizing stator windings of a rotating electromagnetic machine | [2000/51] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'énergisation des bobines statoriques d'une machine électrique tourn | [2007/15] |
Former [2000/51] | Procédé et dispositif d'énergisation des bobines statoriques d'une machine électrique tournante rotative | Examination procedure | 02.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 22.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.07.2008
ADMISSIBLE DR. JOHANNES HEIDENHAIN GmbH Dr.-Johannes-Heidenhain-Str. 5 D-83301 Traunreut / DE | [2008/33] | 18.07.2008 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 22.07.2008 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 20.08.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.03.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.02.2011 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.02.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.03.2011 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.03.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 19.09.2011 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.10.2007 | BE | 10.10.2007 | CH | 10.10.2007 | CY | 10.10.2007 | DK | 10.10.2007 | FI | 10.10.2007 | LI | 10.10.2007 | NL | 10.10.2007 | SE | 10.01.2008 | GR | 11.01.2008 | ES | 21.01.2008 | PT | 10.03.2008 | IE | 19.06.2008 | LU | 19.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | [2010/28] |
Former [2010/11] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
CY | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
FI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
CY | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 10.10.2007 | |
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CH | 10.10.2007 | |
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0841739 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1,12 * column 12, lines 11-42; figures 18-21 ** column 21, lines 40-46 *; | [X] - RAHMAN, M.F.; ZHONE, L.; LIM, K.W., "A DSP based instantaneous torque control strategy for interior", CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 1996 IEEE, THIRTY-FIRST IAS ANNUAL MEETING, IAS, (1996), vol. 1, pages 518 - 524, XP002266082 [X] 1,13-19,12,3-11,2 * column 1, paragraph 2; figure 518 * * page 522, column 1, paragraph 1; figure 2 * * page 521, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 520, column 2, paragraphs 4,5; figures 2,4,5 * * page 518, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 519, column 2, paragraphs 3-5; figure 2 * * page 520, column 2, paragraphs 3,4; figures 2,10 * * page 519, column 2, paragraphs 3-5; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IAS.1996.557082 | [X] - HOLTZ, J.; SPRINGOB, L, "Identification and compensation of torque ripple in high-precision", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, (199604), vol. 43, no. 2, pages 309 - 320, XP002266083 [X] 1,12 * page 312, column 2; figures 1,2 * * page 316, column 2; figure 8 * * page 317; figure 9 * * page 318, column 2; figure 10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/41.491355 |