Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1063761

EP1063761 - Power converters for variable reluctance motors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.05.2009
Database last updated on 25.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.06.2009  [2009/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE UNIVERSITY OF WARWICK
Coventry CV4 7AL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/52]For all designated states
The University of Warwick
Coventry CV4 7AL / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Pollock, Charles
4 Badger Close
Manton, Rutland, LE15 8SQ / GB
[2000/52]
Representative(s)Harding, Richard Patrick , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
4220 Nash Court
Oxford Business Park South
Oxford
OX4 2RU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/52]Harding, Richard Patrick , et al
Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South
Oxford OX4 2RU / GB
Application number, filing date00305264.421.06.2000
[2000/52]
Priority number, dateGB1999001440222.06.1999         Original published format: GB 9914402
[2000/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1063761
Date:27.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:H02P7/05, H02K19/06
[2000/52]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/37]
Former [2000/52]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Leistungswandler für Reluktanzmotoren[2000/52]
English:Power converters for variable reluctance motors[2000/52]
French:Convertisseurs de puissance pour moteurs à reluctance variable[2000/52]
Examination procedure21.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/33]
28.06.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
24.10.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT
22.08.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.01.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/26]
09.02.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
26.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
26.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.08.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200607   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2006
30.06.200708   M06   Fee paid on   26.07.2007
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0886370  (SWITCHED RELUCTANCE DRIVES LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,7,8 * column 3, line 17 - line 41 * * figures 4,5 *;
 [XA]  POLLOCK C ET AL, "ACOUSTIC NOISE CANCELLATION TECHNIQUES FOR SWITCHED RELUCTANCE DRIVES", RECORD OF THE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE (IAS),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19951008), vol. CONF. 30, ISBN 0-7803-3009-9, pages 448 - 455, XP000550975 [X] 1-4,7,8 * page 450, column R, paragraph 2 * * figures 7A,8 * [A]
 [X]  WALE J D ET AL, "NOVEL CONVERTER TOPOLOGIES FOR A TWO-PHASE SWITCHED RELUCTANCE MOTOR WITH FULLY PITCHED WINDINGS", PESC RECORD: ANNUAL IEEE POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE. FORMERLY POWER CONDITIONING SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE 1970 - 1971 AND POWER PROCESSING AND ELECTRONIC SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE 1972,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19960601), vol. CONF. 27, ISBN 0-7803-3501-5, pages 1798 - 1803, XP002045099 [X] 1-3,7-10 * page 1799, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 1799, column R, paragraph 6 * * figure 9 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PESC.1996.548825
 [A]  H. POLLOCK, C.L.C. FU, C. POLLOCK, "Load-resonant converter with zero current switching and variable output power", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, (19971204), vol. 33, no. 25, pages 2081 - 2082, XP002148070 [A] 5 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19971372