Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1067802

EP1067802 - Colour image pickup apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.07.2006
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.08.2006  [2006/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/02]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Suda, Yasuo, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
 [2001/02]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/02]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date00305484.829.06.2000
[2001/02]
Priority number, dateJP1999018566330.06.1999         Original published format: JP 18566399
[2001/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1067802
Date:10.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1067802
Date:27.11.2002
[2002/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04N9/04
[2001/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/33]
Former [2001/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Farbbildaufnahmegerät[2001/02]
English:Colour image pickup apparatus[2001/02]
French:Appareil de prise de vues en couleurs[2001/02]
Examination procedure11.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
11.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/35]
10.04.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/35]
Request for further processing for:07.01.2005Request for further processing filed
07.01.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.01.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
18.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
21.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
20.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9311631  (VLSI VISION LTD [GB]) [X] 1-13,16-18 * page 2, line 5 - page 3, line 6 * * page 4, line 18 - line 32 * * page 6, line 14 - page 7, line 14 * * page 9, line 20 - page 11, line 4 * * page 11, line 19 - page 14, line 13 * * page 15, line 29 - page 17, line 4 * * figures 1,3-5 * [A] 14,15;
 [A]JPH03286566  ;
 [A]EP0896480  (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 10,13 * page 3, line 53 - page 4, line 25 * * figures 1,4 *;
 [A]JPH01248542  ;
 [A]EP0710039  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 16 * column 5, line 4 - line 45 * * figures 1,4 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920324), vol. 016, no. 116, Database accession no. (E - 1181), & JP03286566 A 19911217 (TOSHIBA CORP;OTHERS: 01) [A] 9 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891227), vol. 013, no. 594, Database accession no. (E - 867), & JP01248542 A 19891004 (NEC CORP) [A] 11 * abstract *