Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1096776

EP1096776 - Photobooth/E-mail center [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.12.2004
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.01.2005  [2005/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Massarsky, Yefim
302 Winchester Street Newton
Massachusetts / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Massarsky, Yefim
302 Winchester Street
Newton, Massachusetts / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Jones, Graham Henry
Graham Jones & Company
77 Beaconsfield Road
Blackheath, London SE3 7LG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]Jones, Graham H.
Graham Jones & Company Blackheath 77 Beaconsfield Road
London SE3 7LG / GB
Application number, filing date00305799.910.07.2000
[2001/18]
Priority number, dateUS1999043088701.11.1999         Original published format: US 430887
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1096776
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1096776
Date:09.10.2002
[2002/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/00
[2001/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/18]
TitleGerman:Photokabine/Elektronische Post-Zentrale[2001/18]
English:Photobooth/E-mail center[2001/18]
French:Photomaton/Centre de courier électronique[2001/18]
Examination procedure09.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/50]
23.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/04]
27.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
18.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200405   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9828908  (CRAMPTON STEPHEN JAMES [GB]) [X] 8 * page 5; figure 1; claim 24 * [A] 1-7,9-11;
 [A]US5587740  (BRENNAN JAMES M [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 3 - page 4; claims 1,3 *;
 [A]WO9948276  (FLASHPOINT TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0860980  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1,8 * claim 1 *