Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1069526

EP1069526 - Mobile body discrimination apparatus for rapidly acquiring respective data sets transmitted through modulation of reflected radio waves by transponders which are within a communication region of an interrogator apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.07.2008
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2001/03]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ueno, Shinichiro
1745-18, Kiso-cho
Machida-shi, Tokyo 194-0033 / JP
02 / Fujita, Suguru
2-31-11-501, Shimomaruko, Ota-ku
Tokyo 146-0092 / JP
03 / Ikeda, Shinkichi
1-4-11-302, Iwato Minami
Komae-shi, Tokyo 201-0005 / JP
04 / Maeda, Kenichi
2-55-12-607, Sangenjaya, Setagaya-ku
Tokyo 154-0024 / JP
05 / Sangawa, Ushio
5-10-20, Sagami Ono Sagamihara-shi
Kanagawa-ken 228-0803 / JP
 [2001/03]
Representative(s)Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/03]Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date00305828.611.07.2000
[2001/03]
Priority number, dateJP1999019706312.07.1999         Original published format: JP 19706399
JP1999019706212.07.1999         Original published format: JP 19706299
JP1999019706012.07.1999         Original published format: JP 19706099
JP1999027240527.09.1999         Original published format: JP 27240599
[2001/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1069526
Date:17.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1069526
Date:30.03.2005
[2005/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2005
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/077, G06K7/00
[2004/52]
Former International [2001/03]G06K19/077
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/51]
Former [2001/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gerät zur Unterscheidung von mobilen Objekten zur schnellen Erfassung von jeweiligen Datensets die gesendet werden durch modulierte Funkwellen mittels Transpondern die sich innerhalb des Kommunikationsgebiets des Unterfragungsgeräts befinden[2001/03]
English:Mobile body discrimination apparatus for rapidly acquiring respective data sets transmitted through modulation of reflected radio waves by transponders which are within a communication region of an interrogator apparatus[2001/03]
French:Dispositif de discrimination des objets mobiles pour l'acquisition rapide des données qui sont envoyées par des ondes radios modulées avec des tranpondeurs qui sont à l'intérieur d'une région de communication d'un appareil d'interrogation[2001/03]
Examination procedure27.06.2005Examination requested  [2005/34]
08.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/32]
13.03.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/32]
Divisional application(s)EP06076750.6  / EP1734461
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
09.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
02.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
24.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200708   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0467036  (SAVI TECHN INC) [X] 1 * column 6, line 24 - column 8, line 11; figures 6-8 * [A] 2,14;
 [A]EP0689151  (KIPP LUDWIG) [A] 1,2,14 * column 9, line 26 - column 11, line 13; figure 3 *