Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1070531

EP1070531 - Air separation using monolith adsorbent bed [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.07.2007
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE BOC GROUP, INC.
575 Mountain Avenue, Murray Hill
New Providence, NJ 07974-2082 / US
[2006/38]
Former [2001/04]For all designated states
THE BOC GROUP, INC.
575 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Providence, New Jersey 07974-2082 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Jain, Ravi
15 Moray Avenue
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
02 / Lacava, Alberto I.
415 LaSalle Avenue
Hasbrouck Heights, NJ 07604 / US
03 / Maheshwary, Apurva
33 Roma Street
Nutley, NJ 07110 / US
04 / Ambriano, John Robert
55 Ocean Avenue
Monmouth Beach, NJ 07750 / US
05 / Acharya, Divyanshu R.
771 Mine Road
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
06 / Fitch, Frank R.
56 Edgewood Road
Bedminster, NJ 07921 / US
 [2001/04]
Representative(s)Wickham, Michael , et al
C/o Patent and Trademark Department The BOC Group plc
Chertsey Road
Windlesham
Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/04]Wickham, Michael , et al
c/o Patent and Trademark Department The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road
Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB
Application number, filing date00305991.214.07.2000
[2001/04]
Priority number, dateUS1999036032823.07.1999         Original published format: US 360328
[2001/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1070531
Date:24.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1070531
Date:18.12.2002
[2002/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1070531
Date:20.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP31.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/04, B01D53/047
[2001/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/04]
TitleGerman:Lufttrennung mit einem monolithischen Adsorptionsbett[2001/04]
English:Air separation using monolith adsorbent bed[2001/04]
French:Séparation d'air avec lit adsorbant monolithique[2001/04]
Examination procedure13.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/12]
10.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
10.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.05.2006Fee for grant paid
05.05.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.06.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/35]
Request for further processing for:10.12.2004Request for further processing filed
10.12.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.12.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
20.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.09.2006
BE20.09.2006
CH20.09.2006
CY20.09.2006
FI20.09.2006
IT20.09.2006
LI20.09.2006
NL20.09.2006
DK20.12.2006
SE20.12.2006
GR21.12.2006
ES31.12.2006
PT12.03.2007
[2009/37]
Former [2008/19]AT20.09.2006
BE20.09.2006
CH20.09.2006
FI20.09.2006
IT20.09.2006
LI20.09.2006
NL20.09.2006
DK20.12.2006
SE20.12.2006
GR21.12.2006
ES31.12.2006
PT12.03.2007
Former [2007/37]AT20.09.2006
BE20.09.2006
CH20.09.2006
FI20.09.2006
IT20.09.2006
LI20.09.2006
NL20.09.2006
DK20.12.2006
SE20.12.2006
ES31.12.2006
PT12.03.2007
Former [2007/35]AT20.09.2006
BE20.09.2006
CH20.09.2006
FI20.09.2006
IT20.09.2006
LI20.09.2006
NL20.09.2006
SE20.12.2006
ES31.12.2006
PT12.03.2007
Former [2007/28]AT20.09.2006
BE20.09.2006
CH20.09.2006
FI20.09.2006
LI20.09.2006
NL20.09.2006
SE20.12.2006
ES31.12.2006
PT12.03.2007
Former [2007/26]CH20.09.2006
FI20.09.2006
LI20.09.2006
NL20.09.2006
SE20.12.2006
ES31.12.2006
PT12.03.2007
Former [2007/21]CH20.09.2006
FI20.09.2006
LI20.09.2006
NL20.09.2006
SE20.12.2006
ES31.12.2006
Former [2007/19]CH20.09.2006
FI20.09.2006
LI20.09.2006
NL20.09.2006
SE20.12.2006
Former [2007/09]CH20.09.2006
FI20.09.2006
LI20.09.2006
SE20.12.2006
Former [2007/08]CH20.09.2006
LI20.09.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9829182  (KEEFER BOWIE [CA]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * claims 1,10,11,23,26 *;
 [DX]US5082473  (KEEFER BOWIE G [CA]) [DX] 1-9 * column 6, line 3 - line 31; figure 1 * * column 28, line 4 - line 8 * * column 28, line 43 - line 56 *;
 [X]US4968329  (KEEFER BOWIE G [CA]) [X] 1-9 * column 8, line 11 - line 36; figures 7,9 * * column 27, line 44 - column 28, line 35 * * column 29, line 1 - line 46 *;
 [XA]US4801308  (KEEFER BOWIE G [CA]) [X] 1,3,4 * column 6, line 4 - line 22; figure 1 * [A] 2,7,8;
 [X]US4386947  (MIZUNO JUNZI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract *;
 [X]US5733451  (COELLNER JAMES A [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract *;
 [XA]US5120331  (LANDY KEITH [US]) [X] 1 * claim 1 * [A] 2-9;
 [A]US5338450  (MAURER RICHARD T [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * claims 1-14 *;
 [A]US5384101  (ROCKENFELLER UWE [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *