EP1163866 - A bed base structure for a bed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PARAMOUNT BED COMPANY LIMITED 14-5, Higashi Suna 2-chome Koto-ward Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states PARAMOUNT BED COMPANY LIMITED 14-5, Higashi Suna 2-chome Koto-ward, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takeuchi, Hiroshi Room 25, 16-4 Higashi Suna 3 chome Koto-Ku, Tokyo / JP | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Bryer, Kenneth Robert Bryers LLP 7 Gay Street Bath BA1 2PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | Bryer, Kenneth Robert K.R. Bryer & Co. 7 Gay Street Bath BA1 2PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00305994.6 | 14.07.2000 | [2001/51] | Priority number, date | JP20000178989 | 14.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000178989 | [2001/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1163866 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1163866 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47C20/04, A47C23/06 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
A47C31/123 (EP,US);
A47C20/04 (EP,US);
A47C23/005 (EP,US);
A47C23/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/51] | Title | German: | Bettgestell | [2001/51] | English: | A bed base structure for a bed | [2001/51] | French: | Embase de lit | [2001/51] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 04.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.11.2004 | BE | 17.11.2004 | CH | 17.11.2004 | FR | 17.11.2004 | LI | 17.11.2004 | GR | 17.02.2005 | ES | 28.02.2005 | PT | 17.04.2005 | CY | 14.07.2005 | IE | 14.07.2005 | LU | 14.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 17.11.2004 | |
BE | 17.11.2004 | ||
CH | 17.11.2004 | ||
FR | 17.11.2004 | ||
LI | 17.11.2004 | ||
GR | 17.02.2005 | ||
ES | 28.02.2005 | ||
CY | 14.07.2005 | ||
IE | 14.07.2005 | ||
LU | 14.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 17.11.2004 | |
BE | 17.11.2004 | ||
CH | 17.11.2004 | ||
FR | 17.11.2004 | ||
LI | 17.11.2004 | ||
GR | 17.02.2005 | ||
ES | 28.02.2005 | ||
CY | 14.07.2005 | ||
IE | 14.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 17.11.2004 | |
BE | 17.11.2004 | ||
CH | 17.11.2004 | ||
FR | 17.11.2004 | ||
LI | 17.11.2004 | ||
GR | 17.02.2005 | ||
ES | 28.02.2005 | ||
IE | 14.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | AT | 17.11.2004 | |
BE | 17.11.2004 | ||
CH | 17.11.2004 | ||
FR | 17.11.2004 | ||
LI | 17.11.2004 | ||
GR | 17.02.2005 | ||
ES | 28.02.2005 | ||
IE | 14.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 17.11.2004 | |
BE | 17.11.2004 | ||
CH | 17.11.2004 | ||
LI | 17.11.2004 | ||
GR | 17.02.2005 | ||
ES | 28.02.2005 | ||
IE | 14.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 17.11.2004 | |
BE | 17.11.2004 | ||
CH | 17.11.2004 | ||
LI | 17.11.2004 | ||
GR | 17.02.2005 | ||
ES | 28.02.2005 | ||
IE | 14.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 17.11.2004 | |
BE | 17.11.2004 | ||
CH | 17.11.2004 | ||
LI | 17.11.2004 | ||
GR | 17.02.2005 | ||
ES | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 17.11.2004 | |
CH | 17.11.2004 | ||
LI | 17.11.2004 | ||
GR | 17.02.2005 | ||
ES | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | CH | 17.11.2004 | |
LI | 17.11.2004 | ||
GR | 17.02.2005 | ||
ES | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 17.11.2004 | |
LI | 17.11.2004 | ||
GR | 17.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 17.11.2004 | |
LI | 17.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH10234523 ; | [A]EP0027660 (NO SAG DRAHTFEDERN GMBH [DE]) [A] 5-7* abstract *; | [XA]EP0604241 (PARAMOUNT BED KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,9 * figure -; claims 1,2 * [A] 4-8 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10234523 A 19980908 (FUJI IRYOKI:KK;TACHI S CO LTD; MASAHIDE:KK) [DA] 1-9 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH06343533 | JPH0775657 | JPH07124038 | JPH09577 | JPH10234523 |