EP1069141 - Crosslinkable aqueous fluoropolymer based dispersions, their preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arkema Inc. 2000 Market Street Philadelphia, PA 19103-3222 / US | [2005/16] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states Atofina Chemicals, Inc. 2000 Market Street Philadelphia, PA 19103-3222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hedhli, Lotfi 251 W. DeKalb Pike King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | 02 /
Wempe, Larry 5670 Hill Court Center Valley, Pennsylvania 18034 / US | [2001/03] | Representative(s) | Lhoste, Catherine, et al ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Lhoste, Catherine, et al ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/52] | Lhoste, Catherine, et al ARKEMA France Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/51] | Lhoste, Catherine ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2001/03] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00306013.4 | 14.07.2000 | [2001/03] | Priority number, date | US19990143663P | 14.07.1999 Original published format: US 143663 P | US20000613515 | 10.07.2000 Original published format: US 613515 | [2001/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1069141 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1069141 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08F259/08, C09D157/08 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
C09D151/003 (EP,US);
C08F259/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F259/08, C08F220/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/03] | Extension states | AL | 03.08.2000 | LT | 03.08.2000 | LV | 03.08.2000 | MK | 03.08.2000 | RO | 03.08.2000 | SI | 03.08.2000 | Title | German: | Wässrige vernetzbare auf Fluoropolymeren basierte Dispersionen, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung | [2001/03] | English: | Crosslinkable aqueous fluoropolymer based dispersions, their preparation and use | [2001/03] | French: | Dispersions aqueuses de polymères fluorés réticulables, leur préparation et utilisation | [2001/03] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 03.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.02.2008 | 14.01.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.02.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.02.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/52] | Request for further processing for: | 12.01.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 12.01.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.02.2006 | Decision despatched | 24.12.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 24.12.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.01.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.01.2009 | BE | 14.01.2009 | CY | 14.01.2009 | DK | 14.01.2009 | FI | 14.01.2009 | IT | 14.01.2009 | NL | 14.01.2009 | SE | 14.04.2009 | GR | 15.04.2009 | ES | 25.04.2009 | PT | 15.06.2009 | GB | 14.07.2009 | IE | 14.07.2009 | LU | 14.07.2009 | CH | 31.07.2009 | FR | 31.07.2009 | LI | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IT | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
GB | 14.07.2009 | ||
IE | 14.07.2009 | ||
LU | 14.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IT | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
GB | 14.07.2009 | ||
IE | 14.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
GB | 14.07.2009 | ||
IE | 14.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
GB | 14.07.2009 | ||
IE | 14.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
GB | 14.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
BE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 14.01.2009 | |
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | FI | 14.01.2009 | |
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/33] | NL | 14.01.2009 | |
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | NL | 14.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0360575 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-17* page 17, paragraph 4; examples 4,6; claim -; table - *; | [X]EP0748826 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-17 * example 19 *; | [X]EP0765890 (NIPPON MEKTRON KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-17 * example - * |