Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1081916

EP1081916 - Method and system for exchanging sensitive information in a wireless communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.06.2006
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2009Change - representativepublished on 20.01.2010  [2010/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Phone.Com Inc.
800 Chesapeake Drive
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
[2001/10]
Inventor(s)01 / King, Peter F.
121 Presidio Avenue, Half Moon Bay
CA 94019 / US
 [2001/10]
Representative(s)Ablett, Graham Keith , et al
Ablett & Stebbing
7-8 Market Place
London, W1W 8AG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/03]Ablett, Graham Keith , et al
Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street
London, W1U 6FQ / GB
Former [2001/10]Ablett, Graham Keith , et al
Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street
London W1M 1FD / GB
Application number, filing date00306212.221.07.2000
[2001/10]
Priority number, dateUS19990145439P23.07.1999         Original published format: US 145439 P
US2000055923026.04.2000         Original published format: US 559230
[2001/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1081916
Date:07.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1081916
Date:10.07.2002
[2002/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06
[2001/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/10]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zum Austausch von vertraulichen Daten in einem drahtlosen Kommunikationssystem[2001/10]
English:Method and system for exchanging sensitive information in a wireless communication system[2001/10]
French:Installation et procédé pour l'échange d'informations sensibles dans un système de communication sans fil[2001/10]
Examination procedure09.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/06]
10.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.02.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/31]
14.03.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
08.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
13.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200506   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]  WINSLETT M ET AL, "Assuring security and privacy for digital library transactions on the Web: client and server security policies", DIGITAL LIBRARIES, 1997. ADL '97. PROCEEDINGS., IEEE INTERNATIONAL FORUM ON RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY ADVANCES IN WASHINGTON, DC, USA 7-9 MAY 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19970507), ISBN 0-8186-8010-5, pages 140 - 151, XP010231216 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 142, column L, line 1 - line 19 * * page 142, column R, line 46 - page 143, column L, line 28 * * page 145, column R, line 20 - page 146, column L, line 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ADL.1997.601210
 [A]  ASKWITH B ET AL, "Achieving user privacy in mobile networks", PROCEEDINGS. ANNUAL COMPUTER SECURITY APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE, XX, XX, (19971208), pages 108 - 116, XP002172549 [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 109, column R, line 10 - page 110, column R, line 28 * * page 112, column R, line 22 - page 115, column L, line 9 *